Global Patent Index - EP 1090009 A2

EP 1090009 A2 2001-04-11 - CELL ADHESION-INHIBITING ANTINFLAMMATORY COMPOUNDS

Title (en)

CELL ADHESION-INHIBITING ANTINFLAMMATORY COMPOUNDS

Title (de)

ZELLADHÄSIONSHEMMENDE ANTIINFLAMMATORISCH WIRKENDE VERBINDUNGEN

Title (fr)

COMPOSES ANTI-INFLAMMATOIRES INHIBANT L'ADHESION CELLULAIRE

Publication

EP 1090009 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99926157 A

Priority

  • US 9912419 W
  • US 9070198 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9962908A2] Compounds having Formula (I) are useful for treating inflammation. Also disclosed are pharmaceutical compositions comprising compouns of Formula (I), and methods of inhibiting/treating inflammatory diseases in a mammal.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 495/04; A61K 31/44; A61K 31/50; A61K 31/505; C07D 471/04; C07D 491/04; C07D 498/04; C07D 513/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/4355 (2006.01); A61K 31/4365 (2006.01); A61K 31/437 (2006.01); A61K 31/444 (2006.01); A61K 31/4545 (2006.01); A61K 31/497 (2006.01); A61K 31/519 (2006.01); A61K 31/5377 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); C07D 471/04 (2006.01); C07D 491/04 (2006.01); C07D 491/048 (2006.01); C07D 495/04 (2006.01); C07D 498/04 (2006.01); C07D 513/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 471/04 (2013.01); C07D 491/04 (2013.01); C07D 495/04 (2013.01); C07D 513/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9962908A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9962908 A2 19991209; WO 9962908 A3 20000330; AU 4231299 A 19991220; BG 105109 A 20011130; BR 9910864 A 20020205; CA 2333770 A1 19991209; CN 1332743 A 20020123; EP 1090009 A2 20010411; HU 0102366 A2 20011128; IL 139811 D0 20020210; JP 2002517396 A 20020618; NO 20006157 A 20010202; NO 20006157 D0 20001204; PL 345906 A1 20020114; SK 18542000 A3 20011203; TR 200100189 T2 20010521

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-11 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1035898

2004-09-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040323

2003-10-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030912

2001-08-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: STEWART, ANDREW, O.

2001-08-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BOYD, STEVEN, A.

2001-08-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ARENDSEN, DAVID, L.

2001-08-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BHATIA, PRAMILA

2001-08-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CONDROSKI, KEVIN, R.

2001-08-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FREEMAN, JENNIFER, C.

2001-08-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GUNAWARDANA, INDRANI, W.

2001-08-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ZHU, GUI-DONG

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001204

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 20001204;SI PAYMENT 20001204