Global Patent Index - EP 1090027 A1

EP 1090027 A1 2001-04-11 - NOVEL 17-HALOGENATED 19-NOR STEROIDS, METHOD AND INTERMEDIATES FOR PREPARING SAME, USE AS MEDICINES AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING SAME

Title (en)

NOVEL 17-HALOGENATED 19-NOR STEROIDS, METHOD AND INTERMEDIATES FOR PREPARING SAME, USE AS MEDICINES AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING SAME

Title (de)

NEUE 19-NOR 17-HALO STEROID VERBINDUNGEN, EIN VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS ARTZNEIMITTELN SOWIE PHARMAZEUTISCHE PRÄPARATE DAVON

Title (fr)

NOUVEAUX 19-NOR STEROIDES 17-HALOGENES, PROCEDE ET INTERMEDIAIRES DE PREPARATION, APPLICATION COMME MEDICAMENTS ET COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES LES RENFERMANT

Publication

EP 1090027 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99957166 A

Priority

  • FR 9901491 W
  • FR 9807898 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2780060A1] 17-Halogenated-19-nor steroids of formula (I) and their addition salts with acids and bases, their preparation and their use in medicine. The new compounds are of formula (I): R1 = H, -(CH2)m-Ar, -CO-Ar, -(CH2)m-Alk, or -CO-Alk; R2 = 1-6C saturated or unsaturated hydrocarbon; X = halogen; Y = a single bond, O, NH, S, CO or SO2; Z = H or halogen; n = 2-5; R3 and R4 = H, -(CH2)m'-Ar, -(CH2)m'-Het or -(CH2)m'Alk, or together they form a mono or polycyclic, aromatic or non-aromatic heterocycle with 3 - 15 members and optionally with 1 - 3 addition hetero atoms (O, N, S) and which may be substituted; Ar = carbocyclic aryl of 6-18C atoms; Het = aromatic or non-aromatic heterocycle having 1-9C atoms and 1-5 hetero atoms (O, N, S); Alk = straight, branched or cyclic non-aromatic hydrocarbon residue of 1-12 C atoms, Ar, Het and Alk being optionally substituted; m and m' = 0-3; Independent claims cover intermediates of formulae (I'a), (I'b) and (IIIb):

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07J 41/00; A61K 31/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/565 (2006.01); A61K 31/33 (2006.01); A61K 31/56 (2006.01); A61K 31/58 (2006.01); A61P 3/06 (2006.01); A61P 5/24 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01); A61P 15/12 (2006.01); A61P 19/00 (2006.01); A61P 19/10 (2006.01); C07J 1/00 (2006.01); C07J 41/00 (2006.01); C07J 43/00 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

A61K (2006.01); C07J (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07J 41/0083 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9967274A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2780060 A1 19991224; FR 2780060 B1 20000804; AP 1579 A 20060222; AP 200002007 D0 20001231; AR 018916 A1 20011212; AT 237628 T 20030515; AU 4270599 A 20000110; AU 771369 B2 20040318; BR 9912206 A 20010410; CA 2336167 A1 19991229; CN 1313862 A 20010919; CZ 20004834 A3 20010613; CZ 296246 B6 20060215; DE 69906972 D1 20030522; DE 69906972 T2 20040205; DK 1090027 T3 20030804; DZ 2827 A1 20031201; EA 003325 B1 20030424; EA 200100069 A1 20010625; EP 1090027 A1 20010411; EP 1090027 B1 20030416; ES 2196879 T3 20031216; HR P20000893 A2 20011031; HU 0103194 A2 20020128; HU 0103194 A3 20020930; ID 27410 A 20010405; IL 140416 A 20050725; IL 140416 D0 20020210; JP 2002518516 A 20020625; JP 4509380 B2 20100721; MA 26656 A1 20041220; MY 118101 A 20040830; NO 20006573 A 20010222; NO 20006573 D0 20001221; NO 318381 B1 20050314; NZ 508535 A 20020828; PL 345073 A1 20011203; PT 1090027 E 20030930; SK 19492000 A3 20010911; TN SN99130 A1 20030403; TR 200003857 T2 20010621; TW 550077 B 20030901; UA 66867 C2 20010917; US 2003022874 A1 20030130; US 6423700 B1 20020723; US 6566542 B2 20030520; WO 9967274 A1 19991229; YU 80700 A 20031031; ZA 200007355 B 20011211

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160516

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160614

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160511

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160613

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-07-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: HOLBEINSTRASSE 36-38, 4051 BASEL (CH)

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070622

2008-08-29 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20070403

2008-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070702

2008-06-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070623

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: AVENTIS PHARMA S.A.

- Free text: AVENTIS PHARMA S.A.#20, AVENUE RAYMOND ARON#92160 ANTONY (FR) -TRANSFER TO- AVENTIS PHARMA S.A.#20, AVENUE RAYMOND ARON#92160 ANTONY (FR)

2008-05-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070622

2008-05-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070622

2008-04-30 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20080218

2008-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080101

2008-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070630

2008-03-19 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2008-03-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080101

2008-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070622

2008-02-25 [LTLA] LT: LAPSE OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20070622

2008-02-19 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-02-18 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2008-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070622

2008-01-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071226

2008-01-09 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20071226

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *AVENTIS PHARMA

- Effective date: 20070630

2006-06-02 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20060602

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-30 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20060530

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20060529

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20060529

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060529

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-26 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20060526

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-26 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20060526

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-26 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060526

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-25 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20060525

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060524

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2004-04-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040119

2003-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2196879 T3

2003-09-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20030714

2003-08-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030715

2003-08-04 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-07-16 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030402129

2003-06-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2003-05-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2003-05-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69906972 P 20030522

2003-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-04-22 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-04-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-04-16 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030416

2001-12-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011106

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010123

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20010123;LT PAYMENT 20010123;LV PAYMENT 20010123;MK PAYMENT 20010123;RO PAYMENT 20010123;SI PAYMENT 20010123

2000-05-21 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED