Global patent index - EP 1090030 A1

EP 1090030 A1 2001-04-11 - COMPOUNDS OF UNSTABLE DIPEPTIDYL PEPTIDASE IV INHIBITORS

Title (en)

COMPOUNDS OF UNSTABLE DIPEPTIDYL PEPTIDASE IV INHIBITORS

Title (de)

VERBINDUNGEN VON INSTABILEN DP IV-INHIBITOREN

Title (fr)

COMPOSES D'INHIBITEURS INSTABLES DE LA DIPEPTIDYLPEPTIDASE IV

Publication

EP 1090030 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99931163 A

Priority

  • DE 19828114 A
  • EP 9904381 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9967279A1] The invention relates to compounds of unstable inhibitors of dipeptidyl peptidase IV (DP IV) which comprise general formula A-B-C, whereby A represents an amino acid, B represents the chemical bond between A and C or an amino acid, and C represents an unstable inhibitor of DP IV. Such compounds are used for treating altered glucose tolerance, glucosuria, hyperlipidemia, metabolic acidoses, diabetes mellitus, diabetic neuropathy, nephropathy, and secondary diseases in mammals caused by diabetes mellitus.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 5/083; A61K 38/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 9/99 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/07 (2006.01); A61P 3/06 (2006.01); A61P 3/08 (2006.01); A61P 3/10 (2006.01); A61P 13/12 (2006.01); A61P 25/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07K 5/00 (2006.01); C07K 5/083 (2006.01); C07K 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 5/0808 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9967279A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9967279 A1 19991229; AU 4777299 A 20000110; AU 758843 B2 20030403; BR 9911415 A 20010320; CA 2335978 A1 19991229; CN 100345866 C 20071031; CN 1306541 A 20010801; DE 19828114 A1 20000127; EP 1090030 A1 20010411; HU 0102250 A2 20011128; HU 0102250 A3 20011228; IL 140338 D0 20020210; IS 5739 A 20001128; JP 2002518518 A 20020625; JP 3761781 B2 20060329; NO 20006483 A 20001219; NO 20006483 D0 20001219; NZ 508721 A 20030630; PL 345060 A1 20011119; RU 2226195 C2 20040327; US 2001020006 A1 20010906; US 7053055 B2 20060530

INPADOC legal status

2010-06-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20091229

2010-01-29 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1033326

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2004-10-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PROSIDION LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-05-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PROBIODRUG AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001120

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 20001120;LT PAYMENT 20001120;LV PAYMENT 20001120;MK PAYMENT 20001120;RO PAYMENT 20001120;SI PAYMENT 20001120