Global Patent Index - EP 1090135 A2

EP 1090135 A2 2001-04-11 - METHODS TO SCREEN HERBICIDAL COMPOUNDS UTILIZING AIR SYNTHETASE FROM ARABIDOPSIS THALIANA

Title (en)

METHODS TO SCREEN HERBICIDAL COMPOUNDS UTILIZING AIR SYNTHETASE FROM ARABIDOPSIS THALIANA

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM SCREENEN VON HERBIZIDEN VERBINDUNGEN MITTELS AIR SYNTHETASE AUS ARABIDOPSIS THALIANA

Title (fr)

PROCEDES DE CRIBLAGE DE COMPOSES HERBICIDES UTILISANT AIR SYNTHETASE D'ARABIDOPSIS THALIANA

Publication

EP 1090135 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99936458 A

Priority

  • EP 9904309 W
  • US 10389598 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9967402A2] The present invention discloses methods to screen chemicals for herbicidal activity using recombinantly produced enzymes having AIR synthetase activity, and the use thereby to identify herbicidal chemicals to suppress the growth of undesired vegetation. Furthermore, the present invention provides methods for the development of herbicide tolerance in plants, plant tissues, plant seeds, and plant cells using genes encoding enzymes having AIR synthetase activity, and methods of using such transgenic plants to selectively suppress weed growth in crop fields.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/82; A01H 5/00; C12N 1/21; C12N 9/10; C12N 15/52; C12Q 1/25

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01H 5/00 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 9/00 (2006.01); C12N 9/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/52 (2006.01); C12N 15/82 (2006.01); C12Q 1/02 (2006.01); C12Q 1/25 (2006.01); G01N 33/15 (2006.01); G01N 33/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 9/93 (2013.01); C12N 15/52 (2013.01); C12N 15/8274 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9967402A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9967402 A2 19991229; WO 9967402 A3 20000309; AU 5155299 A 20000110; CA 2329690 A1 19991229; CN 1316004 A 20011003; EP 1090135 A2 20010411; JP 2002518054 A 20020625

INPADOC legal status


2008-02-01 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1035380

2005-04-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041006

2004-07-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040526

2001-04-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001223

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE