Global patent index - EP 1090156 A1

EP 1090156 A1 2001-04-11 - TREATMENT OF AN ALUMINIUM ALLOY MELT

Title (en)

TREATMENT OF AN ALUMINIUM ALLOY MELT

Title (de)

BEHANDLUNG EINER ALUMINIUMLEGIERUNGSSCHMELZE

Title (fr)

TRAITEMENT D'UNE MASSE FONDUE D'ALLIAGE D'ALUMINIUM

Publication

EP 1090156 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99928168 A

Priority

  • EP 99928168 A
  • EP 98810594 A
  • IB 9901260 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0967294A1] The dross forming tendency of an aluminum-magnesium alloy melt is reduced by addition of vanadium and a very small quantity of beryllium. The susceptibility of an aluminum alloy melt containing 2.5 wt.% Mg to dross formation is reduced by addition of 0.02-0.15 wt.% V and less than 60 ppm Be.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 21/06; B22D 21/04; C22C 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 21/04 (2006.01); C22B 9/10 (2006.01); C22B 21/00 (2006.01); C22C 1/02 (2006.01); C22C 21/06 (2006.01); C22C 21/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 21/06 (2013.01); C22C 21/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0000654A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0967294 A1 19991229; AT 234941 T 20030415; AU 4528099 A 20000117; BR 9911582 A 20010320; CA 2336016 A1 20000106; CA 2336016 C 20080212; DE 59904642 D1 20030424; EP 1090156 A1 20010411; EP 1090156 B1 20030319; ES 2193716 T3 20031101; JP 2002519510 A 20020702; JP 4287594 B2 20090701; NO 20006494 A 20001219; NO 20006494 D0 20001219; NO 331736 B1 20120312; US 6994759 B1 20060207; WO 0000654 A1 20000106

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160614

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-03-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031222

2003-12-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2193716

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-07-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-07-01 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-04-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59904642

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-04-24

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-03-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010405

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001221

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT SE