Global Patent Index - EP 1090170 A1

EP 1090170 A1 2001-04-11 - SPINNER FOR SPINNING A SYNTHETIC THREAD

Title (en)

SPINNER FOR SPINNING A SYNTHETIC THREAD

Title (de)

SPINNVORRICHTUNG ZUM SPINNEN EINES SYNTHETISCHEN FADENS

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE FILAGE POUR FILER UN FIL SYNTHETIQUE

Publication

EP 1090170 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99931100 A

Priority

  • DE 19827518 A
  • DE 19829046 A
  • EP 9904225 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9967450A1] The invention relates to a spinner for spinning a synthetic thread. The thread is formed by grouping a plurality of filaments and by winding said filaments on a spool using a spooler mounted downstream from the spinner. An intake cylinder with a gas-permeable wall and a cooling tube are mounted underneath the spinneret. The cooling tube is connected to an airflow generator in such a way that an airflow is formed in the cooling tube in the direction of thread travel. The airflow is formed by a volume of air that flows to the cooling tube through the intake cylinder. According to the invention, the intake cylinder is subdivided into several zones in the direction of thread travel, each of which has a different gas permeability for controlling the volume of air entering into the intake cylinder. It is thereby possible to advantageously influence pre-cooling and the formation of the airflow.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01D 5/092

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01D 5/092 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01D 5/092 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9967450A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9967450 A1 19991229; CN 1141422 C 20040310; CN 1304463 A 20010718; EP 1090170 A1 20010411; EP 1090170 B1 20040818; JP 2002519520 A 20020702; TW 592220 U 20040611; US 2001033037 A1 20011025; US 6572798 B2 20030603

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090617

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090617

2010-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100226

2010-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090617

2010-01-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080630

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080626

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080624

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080620

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080627

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-08-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050519

2005-07-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-02-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050114

2004-09-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910294 P 20040923

2004-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2004-08-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-04-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020214

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010122

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI