Global Patent Index - EP 1090172 A1

EP 1090172 A1 2001-04-11 - DEVICE FOR REMOVING TRASH FROM A MOVING TEXTILE FIBRE LAYER AND CARD EQUIPPED WITH SAME

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR REMOVING TRASH FROM A MOVING TEXTILE FIBRE LAYER AND CARD EQUIPPED WITH SAME

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUSSONDERN VON VERUNREINIGUNGEN AUS EINEM SICH BEWEGENDEN FASERVLIES UND KARDE MIT SOLCH EINER VORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE RETIRER DES DECHETS D'UNE NAPPE DE FIBRES EN MOUVEMENT ET CARDE EQUIPEE D'UN TEL DISPOSITIF

Publication

EP 1090172 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99925095 A

Priority

  • FR 9901424 W
  • FR 9807663 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2779743A1] The invention concerns a device comprising: a transporting cylinder (7) for supporting and transporting the textile fibre layer containing the trash; an elongated container (9) for receiving the trash; a member (8) positioned at the transporting cylinder periphery, and used for separating the trash from the moving textile fibre layer and eject it towards the receiving container; at least one nozzle (10) sucking up the trash into the container, designed to be displaced in translation by a reciprocating motion above and in the receiving container (9) longitudinal direction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01G 15/80

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01G 15/80 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01G 15/805 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9966112A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2779743 A1 19991217; FR 2779743 B1 20000901; DE 69901562 D1 20020627; EP 1090172 A1 20010411; EP 1090172 B1 20020522; WO 9966112 A1 19991223

INPADOC legal status


2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090624

- Year of fee payment: 11

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110615

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-03-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110228

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100625

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091119

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-01-26 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2003-05-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030225

2002-08-23 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020823

2002-06-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69901562 20020627

2002-05-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BRABANT, MARC

2002-05-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: VANBESELAERE, CHRISTIAN

2002-05-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MERTEN, PHILIPPE

2001-10-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010816

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001204

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT