Global patent index - EP 1090175 A1

EP 1090175 A1 2001-04-11 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A FILAMENT YARN WITH ALTERNATING S- AND Z-TWISTS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING A FILAMENT YARN WITH ALTERNATING S- AND Z-TWISTS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ABWECHSELND S- UND Z-DREHUNGEN AUFWEISENDEN FILAMENTGARNES

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE UN FIL CONTINU PRESENTANT EN ALTERNANCE DES TORSIONS S ET DES TORSIONS Z

Publication

EP 1090175 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99938153 A

Priority

  • DE 9901692 W
  • DE 19827870 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19827870C1] Yarn passes a stationary twist stop and is twisted alternately in the S and Z direction by a false twister. Sections of twist are trapped by a series of twist stops that are attached to conveyor belts and move with the yarn through a heat setting and a cooling zone. The heat-set S - Z yarn leaves through delivery rollers. Alternating false twists are preferably inserted using two friction twisters working in opposite directions and switching the yarn path rapidly from one to the other. The moving twist stops can be nip points (3a,3b) fitted to two conveyors (10a,10b) or sprung lever clamps attached to a single conveyor. Heated clamps can also be used.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D02G 3/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D02G 3/28 (2006.01); D02G 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D02G 1/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9967452A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19827870 C1 19991007; AU 5277899 A 20000110; CN 1105794 C 20030416; CN 1306587 A 20010801; DE 19981145 D2 20010809; EP 1090175 A1 20010411; EP 1090175 B1 20030402; JP 2002519521 A 20020702; US 6311467 B1 20011106; WO 9967452 A1 19991229

INPADOC legal status

2005-06-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050604

2005-04-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050101

2004-03-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040105

2004-01-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-08-11 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030811

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59904857

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-05-08

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030428

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001021

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT