Global Patent Index - EP 1090199 A1

EP 1090199 A1 2001-04-11 - SAFETY DEVICE

Title (en)

SAFETY DEVICE

Title (de)

SICHERHEITSEINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE SECURITE

Publication

EP 1090199 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99931131 A

Priority

  • DE 19827722 A
  • EP 9904308 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19827722A1] The answering code signal comprises a heterodyned, unambiguous characteristic, whose existence is a condition for the processing of the answering code signal. Pref. the characteristic depends on the data content of the answering code signal. The characteristic may be a marking of data bits, which is different for data bits of identical information contents. The marking may consist of a variation of data bit transmission performance. The bit time period is greater than the time interval between the delivery of the interrogation code signal and the input time of the answering code signal.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 49/00; G07C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 49/00 (2006.01); G07C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07C 9/00309 (2013.01); G07C 9/00111 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00388 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00555 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00793 (2013.01); G07C 2209/63 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9967486A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19827722 A1 19991223; EP 1090199 A1 20010411; EP 1090199 B1 20031119; ES 2211112 T3 20040701; JP 2002519543 A 20020702; JP 4404485 B2 20100127; US 6731196 B1 20040504; WO 9967486 A1 19991229

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150623

2016-07-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160727

2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150630

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150622

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160101

2016-04-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160229

2016-02-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150623

2016-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150622

2016-02-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2016-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59907808

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140630

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140702

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140509

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140611

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140626

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130622

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120626

- Year of fee payment: 14

2004-11-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040820

2004-07-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2211112 T3

2004-03-09 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-12-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031208

2003-12-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59907808 P 20031224

2003-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-11-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2003-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021119

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001115

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE