Global patent index - EP 1090200 A2

EP 1090200 A2 2001-04-11 - CODING CIRCUIT AND ACTUATING OR CONTROL DEVICE PROVIDED WITH SAID CIRCUIT FOR A SIGNAL ACTUATED CLOSING SYSTEM

Title (en)

CODING CIRCUIT AND ACTUATING OR CONTROL DEVICE PROVIDED WITH SAID CIRCUIT FOR A SIGNAL ACTUATED CLOSING SYSTEM

Title (de)

CODIERSCHALTUNG SOWIE DAMIT VERSEHENE BETÄTIGUNGS- ODER STEUEREINRICHTUNG FÜR EIN SIGNALBETÄTIGBARES SCHLIESSYSTEM

Title (fr)

CIRCUIT DE CODAGE ET DISPOSITIF D'ACTIONNEMENT OU DE COMMANDE POURVU D'UN TEL CIRCUIT ET DESTINE A UN SYSTEME DE FERMETURE ACTIONNABLE PAR SIGNAL

Publication

EP 1090200 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99939913 A

Priority

  • DE 9901802 W
  • DE 19827692 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19827692A1] The circuit includes a programming device (21) for inputting or altering a code (13) in a memory (5). M operating devices (6) are used to sequentially place n locations of a code in the memory during a programming operation. A signal controlled display (9) is connected to the memory for reading out the stored code and displaying it to the operator. An operating device for a code-protected door locking system with a hand-held radio control is also claimed. A control system is also claimed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 49/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07C 9/00857 (2013.01); G07C 9/00817 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00793 (2013.01); G07C 2209/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9967759A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19827692 A1 19991230; DE 19827692 C2 20010613; AT 252677 T 20031115; AU 5406799 A 20000110; EP 1090200 A2 20010411; EP 1090200 B1 20031022; ES 2205868 T3 20040501; WO 9967759 A2 19991229; WO 9967759 A3 20000203

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160727

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59907466

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: KASTEL PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100618

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110706

2011-07-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20110718

2011-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100617

2011-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110101

2011-01-12 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20110101

2010-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HORMANN K.G. ANTRIEBSTECHNIK

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20100630

2009-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090625

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090610

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090610

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090630

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-10-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040723

2004-07-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2205868

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-03-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040211

2003-11-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59907466

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-11-27

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2003-10-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010108

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL