Global Patent Index - EP 1090207 A1

EP 1090207 A1 2001-04-11 - TIE ROD ESPECIALLY FOR SECURING ROCK WALLS, AND A METHOD FOR PRODUCING SUCH A TIE ROD

Title (en)

TIE ROD ESPECIALLY FOR SECURING ROCK WALLS, AND A METHOD FOR PRODUCING SUCH A TIE ROD

Title (de)

ZUGANKER INSBESONDERE ZUR SICHERUNG VON FELSWÄNDEN SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES DERARTIGEN ZUGANKERS

Title (fr)

TIRANT D'ANCRAGE, EN PARTICULIER POUR LA FIXATION DE PAROIS DE ROCHER, ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DUDIT TIRANT

Publication

EP 1090207 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99922153 A

Priority

  • DE 19828371 A
  • EP 9902979 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19828371A1] The continuous reinforcing fibers(18) extend over the entire length of the stabilizing bolt(10) including the threaded area(12) and are embedded in a matrix of a thermoplastic plastic. Independent claims are made for: a) a process for bolt production in which continuous fibers(18) are embedded in a thermoplastic plastic in a coextrusion or pultrusion process, the bar(10) is cut to length and the thread(12) formed under heat and pressure; c) a process in which a braid of dry fibers is impregnated with liquid thermoplastic and the matrix is then solidified; d) a use of the bolt for structural stabilization in a bore in a rock or construction. in which the bolt is locally heated above the flow temperature of the plastic and bonds with the bore wall. Preferred Features: The thread (12) is heat formed in the bar without creating stresses. The bolt has a hollow centre(22) and axially spaced transverse grooves(26).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21D 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21D 21/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21D 21/0026 (2013.01); E21D 21/0006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0000718A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19828371 A1 19991230; AT 252197 T 20031115; AU 3929999 A 20000117; EP 1090207 A1 20010411; EP 1090207 B1 20031015; ES 2211084 T3 20040701; WO 0000718 A1 20000106

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130504

2015-07-10 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20150710

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140131

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120629

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120618

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090503

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-01-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090503

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080630

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080527

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080521

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040315

2006-01-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2005-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2004-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SIKA SCHWEIZ A.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-10-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040716

2004-07-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040728

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-07-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2211084

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-04-14 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20031015

2004-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2004-02-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: SIKA TECHNOLOGY AG

2004-01-15 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040115

2004-01-15 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040115

2003-11-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59907379

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-11-20

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-10-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2003-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-10-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-10-15 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031015

2003-10-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031015

2003-10-15 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031015

2002-09-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIKA SCHWEIZ AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010111

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE