Global patent index - EP 1090208 A2

EP 1090208 A2 2001-04-11 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR COOLING A LOW-PRESSURE STAGE OF A STEAM TURBINE

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR COOLING A LOW-PRESSURE STAGE OF A STEAM TURBINE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR KÜHLUNG EINER NIEDERDRUCKSTUFE EINER DAMPFTURBINE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LE REFROIDISSEMENT D'UN ETAGE BASSE PRESSION D'UNE TURBINE A VAPEUR

Publication

EP 1090208 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99936273 A

Priority

  • DE 9901493 W
  • DE 19823251 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19823251C1] The invention relates to a method and device for cooling at least one low-pressure stage (4) of a steam turbine (1) comprising a steam admission area (2) and a steam exhaust area (3). The steam turbine (1) is connected to at least one condenser (5) or is configured as a back pressure turbine. Condensate and/or steam from a cooling system (6) is injected as a cooling medium into the low-pressure stage (4) via a dosing device (7). Said condensate and/or steam is injected according to a temperature value which is measured in the low-pressure stage (4) and according to a parameter which is directly or indirectly correlated to the mass flow rate through the low-pressure stage (4). In an advantageous manner, such a method for cooling a low-pressure stage (4) of a steam turbine (1) reduces the exposure of the steam turbine (1) blades to the risk of erosion resulting from the beating of drops and is easier to control than control systems which are only dependent on temperature.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 25/12; F01K 13/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 25/12 (2006.01); F01D 25/30 (2006.01); F01K 9/04 (2006.01); F01K 13/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01K 13/025 (2013.01); F01D 25/12 (2013.01); F05D 2220/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9961758A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19823251 C1 19990708; CN 1119506 C 20030827; CN 1306600 A 20010801; EP 1090208 A2 20010411; EP 1090208 B1 20030502; JP 2002516946 A 20020611; JP 4253128 B2 20090408; WO 9961758 A2 19991202; WO 9961758 A3 20000113

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160802

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160512

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160512

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG;INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY FREILAGERSTRASSE 40;8047 ZUERICH (CH)

2004-04-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040203

2004-02-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-09-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-06-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59905336

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-06-05

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2003-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001108

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI