Global patent index - EP 1090209 A1

EP 1090209 A1 2001-04-11 - METHOD FOR STARTING AN ELECTROMECHANICAL REGULATING DEVICE ESPECIALLY DESIGNED FOR CONTROLLING THE CHARGE CYCLE IN AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR STARTING AN ELECTROMECHANICAL REGULATING DEVICE ESPECIALLY DESIGNED FOR CONTROLLING THE CHARGE CYCLE IN AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM STARTEN EINES ELEKTROMECHANISCHEN STELLGERÄTS, DAS INSBESONDERE ZUM STEUERN DES GASWECHSELS BEI EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE VORGESEHEN IST

Title (fr)

PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE METTRE EN MARCHE UN DISPOSITIF DE REGULATION ELECTROMECANIQUE, CON U NOTAMMENT POUR REGULER LES ECHANGES GAZEUX DANS UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION

Publication

EP 1090209 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99932723 A

Priority

  • DE 19828612 A
  • EP 9904387 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0000720A1] The invention relates to an electromechanical regulating device having an actuating element (2) and an actuating drive (1). Said actuating drive comprises at least a first electromagnet with a first coil (13) and a second electromagnet with a second coil (15), in addition to an armature that can move between the locating surfaces (17a, 17b) of the first and second electromagnets and at least one recoil means (18a, 18b) mechanically coupled to the armature. In order to start the regulating device, the second coil is powered until a first predetermined condition is fulfilled and the first coil is then powered once a second condition is fulfilled until the armature comes into contact with the locating surface (17a).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/04 (2006.01); F02D 13/02 (2006.01); F16K 31/06 (2006.01); H01F 7/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0000720A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0000720 A1 20000106; EP 1090209 A1 20010411; EP 1090209 B1 20021023; JP 2002519858 A 20020702; US 2001025611 A1 20011004; US 6308668 B2 20011030

INPADOC legal status

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090624

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100226

2010-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090624

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080620

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080613

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080620

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070629

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070611

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-08-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070822

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-23 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060623

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060613

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-10-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030724

2003-05-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-02-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030203

2002-11-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59903180

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-11-28

2002-11-20 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2002-11-20 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SIEMENS VDO AUTOMOTIVE CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2002-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-10-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020503

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001215

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB