Global Patent Index - EP 1090210 A1

EP 1090210 A1 2001-04-11 - METHOD FOR REMOVING OIL FROM CRANKCASE VENTILATION GASES AND DEVICES FOR IMPLEMENTING SAID METHOD

Title (en)

METHOD FOR REMOVING OIL FROM CRANKCASE VENTILATION GASES AND DEVICES FOR IMPLEMENTING SAID METHOD

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR ENTÖLUNG VON KURBELGEHÄUSEENTLÜFTUNGSGASEN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE DESHUILAGE DES GAZ DE VENTILATION D'UN CARTER DE VILEBREQUIN ET DISPOSITIFS POUR LA MISE EN OEUVRE DE CE PROCEDE

Publication

EP 1090210 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00929385 A

Priority

  • DE 19918311 A
  • EP 0003549 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19918311A1] The invention relates to a method for removing oil from crankcase ventilation gases in an internal combustion engine, whereby an oil separating element (1), e.g. a cyclone, is cross flown by the crankcase ventilation gases and the oil droplets contained therein are separated. The method according to the invention is characterized in that the volumetric flow (2) of the crankcase ventilation gases is subdivided into at least two partial volumetric flows (21, 22, 23, 24) and at least one partial volumetric flow is guided through at least one oil separating element (1), wherein the size of the at least two partial volumetric flows (21 - 24) is regulated depending on the size of the volumetric flow (2). The invention also relates to devices for implementing the inventive method.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01M 13/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01D 45/12 (2006.01); F01M 13/00 (2006.01); F01M 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01M 13/04 (2013.01); F01M 2013/0066 (2013.01); F01M 2013/0427 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0065206A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19918311 A1 20001102; BR 0006995 A 20050412; EP 1090210 A1 20010411; EP 1090210 B1 20030917; EP 1090210 B2 20111012; JP 2002543321 A 20021217; JP 4033633 B2 20080116; US 6684864 B1 20040203; WO 0065206 A1 20001102; WO 0065206 A9 20010315

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2014-01-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20131231

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120504

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-12-01 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Ref Legal Event Code: R102

- Ref Document Number: 50003709

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20111012

2011-10-12 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20111012

2011-10-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2011-10-12 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Ref Legal Event Code: R102

- Ref Document Number: 50003709

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2004-08-11 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: MANN + HUMMEL GMBH

- Effective date: 20040615

2004-08-11 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: MAHLE FILTERSYSTEME GMBH ROTERMUND + PFUSCH + BERN

- Effective date: 20040616

2004-07-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-04-21 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2004-03-17 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20030917

2004-02-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Ref Legal Event Code: LTIE

- Effective date: 20030917

2003-12-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031217

2003-10-29 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2003-10-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50003709

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-10-23

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-09-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-09-17 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030917

2003-09-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030917

2003-09-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030917

2002-12-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HENGST GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-03-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020131

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001209

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI