Global Patent Index - EP 1090221 A1

EP 1090221 A1 2001-04-11 - METHOD FOR OPERATING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE, ESPECIALLY OF AN AUTOMOBILE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR OPERATING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE, ESPECIALLY OF AN AUTOMOBILE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE INSBESONDERE EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE, NOTAMMENT POUR UN VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE

Publication

EP 1090221 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99939317 A

Priority

  • DE 9901730 W
  • DE 19827609 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19827609A1] A procedure for running an IC engine (1), especially of a car, has the fuel to be injected for combustion injected directly into a combustion chamber (4) during an induction phase and during a compression phase. The pressure is determined with which the fuel is injected into the combustion chamber and the fuel is injected during the induction phase when the pressure is less than a preset minimum pressure. The fuel is injected during the compression phase when the pressure is higher than a preset minimum pressure. The fuel is injected again during the induction phase when the pressure is less than a preset hysteresis pressure, this being less than the minimum pressure.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/40; F02D 41/06; F02D 41/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/40 (2006.01); F02D 41/06 (2006.01); F02D 41/30 (2006.01); F02D 41/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/3863 (2013.01); F02D 41/062 (2013.01); F02D 41/3076 (2013.01); F02D 41/3818 (2013.01); F02D 41/3836 (2013.01); F02D 41/3029 (2013.01); F02D 2200/0602 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9967526A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19827609 A1 19991223; EP 1090221 A1 20010411; EP 1090221 B1 20030903; JP 2002519561 A 20020702; JP 4650975 B2 20110316; US 6439190 B1 20020827; WO 9967526 A1 19991229

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160101

2016-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59906879

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-03-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20150227

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140808

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130703

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100612

2011-02-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100612

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090623

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-08-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040604

2004-06-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-01-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20031220

2003-10-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59906879

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-10-09

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-09-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010823

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010122

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB