Global Patent Index - EP 1090223 A1

EP 1090223 A1 2001-04-11 - MANIFOLD HOUSING SYSTEM

Title (en)

MANIFOLD HOUSING SYSTEM

Title (de)

GEHÄUSESYSTEM FÜR EINE SAUGROHRANLAGE

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE CARTER DE COLLECTEUR

Publication

EP 1090223 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99928949 A

Priority

  • CA 9900592 W
  • US 9051298 P
  • US 33608199 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0077384A1] A field replaceable unitary manifold housing for providing combustion air and combustion fuel to an internal combustion engine is disclosed. The housing (16) includes an air purification cavity (22) having a spaced apart air intake (14) and air discharge. The housing also includes a filter (30) for purifying air disposed in the air purification cavity intermediate the air intake and the air discharge. The housing also includes a hollow elongate member (70) having a first end (74) coupled to the filter and a second end coupled to a plenum chamber (22) for directing the air, the plenum chamber being integral with the air purification cavity. The housing also includes a plurality of channels (122), each channel integral with the housing and having a first end integral with the plenum chamber and a second end coupled to a cylinder head of the engine. The air intake induces air into the air purification cavity, the induced air is purified by the filter, the hollow elongate member directs the air from the filter to the plenum chamber, and the plurality of channels direct the air from the plenum chamber to the cylinder head.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 35/04; F02M 35/112

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02B 75/22 (2006.01); F02M 35/04 (2006.01); F02M 35/10 (2006.01); F02M 35/104 (2006.01); F02M 35/112 (2006.01); F02M 37/00 (2006.01); F02M 55/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 35/10144 (2013.01); F02B 75/22 (2013.01); F02M 35/04 (2013.01); F02M 35/10052 (2013.01); F02M 35/10111 (2013.01); F02M 35/10216 (2013.01); F02M 35/10347 (2013.01); F02M 35/1036 (2013.01); F02M 35/112 (2013.01); F02M 35/10321 (2013.01); F02M 35/10327 (2013.01); F05C 2201/021 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0077384A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0077384 A1 20001221; DE 69902540 D1 20020919; DE 69902540 T2 20030410; EP 1090223 A1 20010411; EP 1090223 B1 20020814; JP 2003502559 A 20030121

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160831

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-04-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-16 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040625

2004-06-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040625

2003-08-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030515

2003-06-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030627

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-06-11 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030611

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-05-28 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: POWELL, JEFFREY, JOSEPH

2003-03-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-09-25 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SIEMENS VDO AUTOMOTIVE INC.

2002-09-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69902540 20020919

2002-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-08-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010406

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001227

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB