Global Patent Index - EP 1090226 A1

EP 1090226 A1 2001-04-11 - DUAL PUMP UNIT

Title (en)

DUAL PUMP UNIT

Title (de)

DOPPELPUMPEN-AGGREGAT

Title (fr)

GROUPE A DEUX POMPES

Publication

EP 1090226 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99931129 A

Priority

  • DE 19828180 A
  • EP 9904303 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19828180A1] A dual pump unit comprising two hydraulic pumps (2, 3) with coaxially mounted drive shafts (4, 5) that are coupled to each other in a non-positive fit by means of a coupling member (28). The coupling member (28) surrounds a connecting member (15), wherein high pressure lines (29, 30) and low pressure lines (31, 32) are formed. The connecting member(15) extends between two control bodies (33) that are respectively associated with one hydraulic pump (2,3) and which are used to create a cyclic connection between the cylinders (18, 19) of the hydraulic pumps (2, 3) and the high pressure lines (29, 30) and low pressure lines (31, 32). The connecting member (15) consists of two connector plates (13, 14) defining one of the hydraulic pumps (2, 3) respectively on the control bodies (33, 43) and an individually formed interchangeable intermediate element (38) arranged between the connector plates (13,14). The connector plates (13, 14) each have a recess (34, 35) into which the intermediate element (38) can be respectively inserted so that the connector plates (13) can radially encompass the intermediate element (38) and the intermediate element (38) can be fixed between the connector plates (13, 14).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 1/22; F04B 23/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 1/20 (2006.01); F04B 1/22 (2006.01); F04B 23/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 23/106 (2013.01); F04B 1/2064 (2013.01); F04B 1/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9967532A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19828180 A1 20000113; DE 19828180 C2 20000420; EP 1090226 A1 20010411; EP 1090226 B1 20030305; WO 9967532 A1 19991229

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130622

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130701

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130622

2014-03-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-03-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59904464

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-02-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20130622

2014-02-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2014-01-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130623

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120822

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120621

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120621

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120705

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120625

- Year of fee payment: 14

2004-02-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031208

2003-11-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-06-24 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-04-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59904464

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-04-10

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-03-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030305

2003-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2003-03-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000428

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE