Global Patent Index - EP 1090231 A1

EP 1090231 A1 2001-04-11 - FRICTIONAL VACUUM PUMP WITH CHASSIS, ROTOR, HOUSING AND DEVICE FITTED WITH SUCH A FRICTIONAL VACUUM PUMP

Title (en)

FRICTIONAL VACUUM PUMP WITH CHASSIS, ROTOR, HOUSING AND DEVICE FITTED WITH SUCH A FRICTIONAL VACUUM PUMP

Title (de)

REIBUNGSVAKUUMPUMPE MIT CHASSIS, ROTOR UND GEHÄUSE SOWIE EINRICHTUNG, AUSGERÜSTET MIT EINER REIBUNGSVAKUUMPUMPE DIESER ART

Title (fr)

POMPE A VIDE ROTATIVE MUNIE D'UN CHASSIS, D'UN ROTOR ET D'UN CARTER, ET DISPOSITIF POURVU D'UNE POMPE A VIDE ROTATIVE DE CE TYPE

Publication

EP 1090231 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99917896 A

Priority

  • DE 19823270 A
  • DE 19901340 A
  • EP 9902122 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6457954B1] A friction vacuum pump (1) with a frame (5), stator (3), rotor (4) and housing; all functional elements of the pump are combined into one unit (22), which, in turn, can be inserted into a housing (19, 55) that has been adapted to a specific application; using this procedure, all separate connection housing can be eliminated and optimal conductance can be achieved (FIG. 1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 19/04; F04D 17/16; F04D 29/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 17/16 (2006.01); F04D 19/04 (2006.01); F04D 29/60 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 19/04 (2013.01); F04D 17/168 (2013.01); F04D 29/602 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9961799A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

US 6457954 B1 20021001; DE 59912626 D1 20060216; DE 59912629 D1 20060216; EP 1090231 A1 20010411; EP 1090231 B1 20051005; EP 1090231 B2 20150708; JP 2002516959 A 20020611; JP 4520636 B2 20100811; WO 9961799 A1 19991202

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170327

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: LEYBOLD GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OERLIKON LEYBOLD VACUUM GMBH, 50968 KOELN, DE

- Document: DE 59912626

2016-11-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59912626

- Representative's name: DOMPATENT VON KREISLER SELTING WERNER - PARTNE, DE

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160331

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-09-01 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: OERLIKON LEYBOLD VACUUM GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: LEYBOLD VAKUUM GMBH, 50968 KOELN, DE

- Document: DE 59912626

2015-09-01 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: LEYBOLD GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: LEYBOLD VAKUUM GMBH, 50968 KOELN, DE

- Document: DE 59912626

2015-09-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59912626

- Representative's name: VON KREISLER SELTING WERNER - PARTNERSCHAFT VO, DE

2015-09-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59912626

- Representative's name: DOMPATENT VON KREISLER SELTING WERNER - PARTNE, DE

2015-07-08 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20150708

2015-07-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2015-07-08 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 59912626

2015-07-01 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: OERLIKON LEYBOLD VACUUM GMBH

2012-08-30 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59912626

- Representative's name: VON KREISLER SELTING WERNER - PARTNERSCHAFT VO, DE

2012-08-30 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59912626

- Representative's name: DOMPATENT VON KREISLER SELTING WERNER - PARTNE, DE

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110327

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-12-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111130

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100402

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100327

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-12-16 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: PFEIFFER VACUUM GMBH

- Effective date: 20060703

2009-12-16 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: VARIAN S.P.A.

- Effective date: 20060705

2009-12-16 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: THE BOC GROUP LIMITED

- Effective date: 20060705

2009-12-02 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: PFEIFFER VACUUM GMBH

- Effective date: 20060703

2009-12-02 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: VARIAN S.P.A.

- Effective date: 20060705

2009-12-02 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: THE BOC GROUP PLC

- Effective date: 20060705

2007-07-18 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: PFEIFFER VACUUM GMBH

- Effective date: 20060703

2007-07-18 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: VARIAN S.P.A.

- Effective date: 20060705

2007-07-18 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: THE BOC GROUP PLC

- Effective date: 20060705

2006-08-09 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: PFEIFFER VACUUM GMBH

- Effective date: 20060703

2006-08-09 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: VARIAN S.P.A.

- Effective date: 20060705

2006-08-09 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: THE BOC GROUP PLC

- Effective date: 20060705

2006-06-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-02-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59912626 P 20060216

2006-01-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060104

2005-10-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-10-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-10-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LEYBOLD VACUUM GMBH

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001002

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT