Global Patent Index - EP 1090249 A2

EP 1090249 A2 2001-04-11 - RESILIENT CONTAINERS FOR HYPERPOLARIZED GASES

Title (en)

RESILIENT CONTAINERS FOR HYPERPOLARIZED GASES

Title (de)

ELASTICHER BEHÄLTER FÜR HYPERPOLARISIERTE GASE

Title (fr)

RECIPIENTS SOUPLES POUR GAZ HYPERPOLARISES

Publication

EP 1090249 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99928724 A

Priority

  • US 9913597 W
  • US 8969298 P
  • US 12644898 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9966255A2] A resilient multi-layer container is configured to receive a quantity of hyperpolarized noble fluid such as gas and includes a wall with at least two layers, a first layer with a surface which minimizes contact-induced spin-relaxation and a first or second layer which is substantially impermeable to oxygen. The container is especially suitable for collecting and transporting <3>He. The resilient container can be formed of material layers which are concurrently responsive to pressure such as polymers, deuterated polymers, or metallic films. The container can include a capillary stem and/or a port or valve isolation means to inhibit the flow of gas from the main volume of the container during transport. The resilient container can be configured to directly deliver the hyperpolarized noble gas to a target interface by deflating or collapsing the inflated resilient container. In addition, single layer resilient containers with T1's of above 4 hours for <129>Xe and above 6 hours for <3>He include materials with selected relaxivity values. In addition, a bag with a port fitting or valve member and one or more of a capillary stem and port isolation means is configured to minimize the depolarizing effect of the container valve or fitting(s). Also disclosed is a method for determining the gas solubility in an unknown polymer or liquid using the measured relaxation time of a hyperpolarized gas.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F17C 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F17B 1/26 (2006.01); A61B 5/055 (2006.01); A61K 49/18 (2006.01); F17C 1/00 (2006.01); F17C 1/16 (2006.01); F17C 3/00 (2006.01); F17C 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01R 33/282 (2013.01); A61K 49/1815 (2013.01); F17C 1/00 (2013.01); F17C 1/16 (2013.01); F17C 3/00 (2013.01); F17C 13/002 (2013.01); F17C 13/005 (2013.01); F17C 2201/0128 (2013.01); F17C 2201/0157 (2013.01); F17C 2201/0176 (2013.01); F17C 2203/032 (2013.01); F17C 2203/0604 (2013.01); F17C 2203/0619 (2013.01); F17C 2203/0646 (2013.01); F17C 2203/066 (2013.01); F17C 2203/0697 (2013.01); F17C 2205/0115 (2013.01); F17C 2205/0323 (2013.01); F17C 2205/0329 (2013.01); F17C 2205/0364 (2013.01); F17C 2205/0394 (2013.01); F17C 2221/017 (2013.01); F17C 2221/07 (2013.01); F17C 2223/0123 (2013.01); F17C 2260/013 (2013.01); F17C 2260/018 (2013.01); F17C 2260/02 (2013.01); F17C 2260/026 (2013.01); F17C 2260/05 (2013.01); F17C 2270/02 (2013.01); F17C 2270/025 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9966255A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9966255 A2 19991223; WO 9966255 A3 20000427; AT 523776 T 20110915; AU 4572299 A 20000105; AU 745398 B2 20020321; BR 9912163 A 20010410; CA 2335467 A1 19991223; CA 2335467 C 20081118; CA 2637700 A1 19991223; CN 1117942 C 20030813; CN 1312909 A 20010912; EP 1090249 A2 20010411; EP 2040063 A1 20090325; EP 2040063 B1 20110907; HU 0103605 A2 20020328; HU 0103605 A3 20021128; JP 2002518652 A 20020625; NZ 508720 A 20030829

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-08 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20081129

2007-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021025

2006-09-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021025

2002-12-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021025

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010117

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE