Global Patent Index - EP 1090261 A1

EP 1090261 A1 2001-04-11 - TILTABLE LIGHT-ARC FURNACE

Title (en)

TILTABLE LIGHT-ARC FURNACE

Title (de)

KIPPBARER LICHTBOGENOFEN

Title (fr)

FOUR A ARC BASCULANT

Publication

EP 1090261 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99926365 A

Priority

  • DE 19823226 A
  • EP 9903523 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19823226A1] The invention relates to a tiltable light-arc furnace in which a furnace casing (2) and a portal (4) for an electrode lifting and pivoting device are positioned on a platform (1 and 3) of a weighing machine which can be tilted by means of a tilting device. The weighing machine comprises two rockers (16) which are situated at a distance from each other and each move on a track (17). The furnace casing (2) is positioned on a first platform area situated between the rockers (16) and the portal (4) is arranged on a second platform area situated outside the rockers (16). According to the invention the two platform areas are configured as separate platform parts (1, 3) which are connected by means of a hinge joint (13). The platform part (3) carrying the portal (4) is supported on an additional track (21) via a further rocker (20) and by means of a tilting device can be tilted synchronously with the platform part (1) carrying the furnace casing (2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F27B 3/08; C21C 5/52; F27B 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21C 5/52 (2006.01); F27B 3/06 (2006.01); F27B 3/08 (2006.01); F27B 3/10 (2006.01); F27D 11/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F27B 3/085 (2013.01); F27B 3/065 (2013.01); F27B 3/10 (2013.01); F27D 11/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9961857A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19823226 A1 19991202; AT 222346 T 20020815; AU 4365999 A 19991213; BR 9910694 A 20010130; CA 2332951 A1 19991202; CA 2332951 C 20050315; CN 1229614 C 20051130; CN 1302370 A 20010704; EP 1090261 A1 20010411; EP 1090261 B1 20020814; ES 2182532 T3 20030301; HK 1038786 A1 20060331; PL 186668 B1 20040227; PL 344340 A1 20011105; RU 2206031 C2 20030610; TR 200003477 T2 20010321; US 6393043 B1 20020521; WO 9961857 A1 19991202

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100522

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100521

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110706

2011-07-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110718

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100521

2011-03-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100522

2011-02-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-02-15 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-01-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100521

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-01-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090521

2010-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2010-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2009-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090514

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090525

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090527

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090512

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090626

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080807

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080721

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080416

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ARCMET TECHNOLOGIE GMBH

- Free text: ARCMET TECHNOLOGIE GMBH#TURMSTRASSE 44#4030 LINZ (AT) -TRANSFER TO- ARCMET TECHNOLOGIE GMBH#TURMSTRASSE 44#4030 LINZ (AT)

2003-08-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030515

2003-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2182532 T3

2003-02-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-09-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902359 20020919

2002-09-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020814

2002-08-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2002-08-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 222346 T 20020815

2001-11-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011009

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001102

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE