Global patent index - EP 1090263 A1

EP 1090263 A1 2001-04-11 - METHOD FOR REMOTE CONTROLLED COMBAT OF NEAR-SURFACE AND/OR SURFACE TARGETS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR REMOTE CONTROLLED COMBAT OF NEAR-SURFACE AND/OR SURFACE TARGETS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM FERNGESTEUERTEN BEKÄMPFEN BODENNAHER UND/ODER BODENGEBUNDENER ZIELE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR COMBATTRE A DISTANCE DES CIBLES PROCHES DU SOL ET/OU SUR LE SOL

Publication

EP 1090263 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99927726 A

Priority

  • DE 9901862 W
  • DE 19828644 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19828644A1] The invention relates to a method for combating near-surface and/or surface targets such as tanks or the like by using a missile comprising a seeker head, an effective charge and at least one thruster. According to the invention, the missile is redirected into an essentially horizontal cruising and seeking phase after completing an essentially vertical start phase. During said cruising and seeking phase, the missile scans the terrain ahead of it using the seeking head, whereupon an approaching phase which is directed in an essentially downward direction follows after the finally ensues head locks onto an identified target. An external reconnaissance system in an appropriate aircraft and/or spacecraft such as in a helicopter, a drone or in a satellite receives information for guiding the missile which is transmitted to the same.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41G 7/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41G 7/22 (2006.01); F42B 15/01 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41G 7/2206 (2013.01); F41G 3/02 (2013.01); F41G 3/165 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0000779A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19828644 A1 20000120; DE 19828644 C2 20011206; CA 2334373 A1 20000106; CA 2334373 C 20060314; EP 1090263 A1 20010411; EP 1090263 B1 20020522; JP 2002519619 A 20020702; JP 4262889 B2 20090513; US 6455828 B1 20020924; WO 0000779 A1 20000106; WO 0000779 B1 20000427

INPADOC legal status

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130701

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130625

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130625

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-04-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59901512

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-03-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-02-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20130625

2013-05-02 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MBDA DEUTSCHLAND GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59901512

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130307

2013-05-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59901512

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT, DE

- Effective date: 20130307

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120627

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120622

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120705

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120622

- Year of fee payment: 14

2003-05-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030225

2002-08-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-06-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59901512

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-06-27

2002-06-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020524

2002-05-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-09-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010814

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001102

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT