EP 1090362 A4 20070502 - A SCALABLE SYSTEM FOR CLUSTERING OF LARGE DATABASES HAVING MIXED DATA ATTRIBUTES
Title (en)
A SCALABLE SYSTEM FOR CLUSTERING OF LARGE DATABASES HAVING MIXED DATA ATTRIBUTES
Title (de)
SKALIERBARES VERFAHREN ZUM ZUSAMMENFASSEN VON GROSSEN DATEIEN MIT GEMISCHTEN DATENZUSÄTZEN
Title (fr)
SYSTEME A ECHELLE VARIABLE PERMETTANT LE GROUPEMENT DE GRANDES BASES DE DONNEES A ATTRIBUTS DE DONNEES MIXTES
Publication
Application
Priority
- US 9906717 W 19990329
- US 8390698 A 19980522
- US 8641098 P 19980522
IPC 8 full level
G06F 17/30 (2006.01); G06K 9/62 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
G06F 16/30 (2018.12 - EP US); G06F 18/2321 (2023.01 - EP)
Citation (search report)
- [X] US 5619709 A 19970408 - CAID WILLIAM R [US], et al
- [A] US 5179643 A 19930112 - HOMMA KOICHI [JP], et al
- [A] US 5687364 A 19971111 - SAUND ERIC [US], et al
- [A] US 5448727 A 19950905 - ANNEVELINK JURGEN [US]
- [A] NEAL, R. M. HINTON, G. E.: "A View of the EM Algorithm that Justifies Incremental, Sparse, and Other Variants", NATO ASI SERIES D BEHAVIOURAL AND SOCIAL SCIENCES, vol. 89, 1998, pages 355 - 370, XP002420662
- [A] T. ZHANG ET AL.: "BIRCH: A new data clustering algorithm and its applications", DATA MINING AND KNOWLEDGE DISCOVERY, vol. 1, 1997, pages 141 - 182, XP002420663
- [A] XIAOWEI XU ET AL: "A distribution-based clustering algorithm for mining in large spatial databases", DATA ENGINEERING, 1998. PROCEEDINGS., 14TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ORLANDO, FL, USA 23-27 FEB. 1998, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, 23 February 1998 (1998-02-23), pages 324 - 331, XP010268334, ISBN: 0-8186-8289-2
- [A] IWAYAMA M ET AL: "Hierarchical Bayesian Clustering for automatic text classification", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL JOINT CONFERENCE ON ARTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE, XX, XX, vol. 2, 20 August 1995 (1995-08-20), pages 1322 - 1327, XP002116465
- [A] FAYYAD U ED - HANSEN D ET AL: "Data mining and knowledge discovery in databases: implications for scientific databases", SCIENTIFIC AND STATISTICAL DATABASE MANAGEMENT, 1997. PROCEEDINGS., NINTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON OLYMPIA, WA, USA 11-13 AUG. 1997, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, 11 August 1997 (1997-08-11), pages 2 - 11, XP010245150, ISBN: 0-8186-7952-2
- See references of WO 9962007A1
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
DOCDB simple family (publication)
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 99914207 A 19990329