Global Patent Index - EP 1090387 A1

EP 1090387 A1 2001-04-11 - METHOD FOR APPLYING AN ATTENUATING COATING ON SURFACE WAVE COMPONENTS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR APPLYING AN ATTENUATING COATING ON SURFACE WAVE COMPONENTS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR DÄMPFENDEN BESCHICHTUNG VON OBERFLÄCHENWELLENBAUELEMENTEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'APPLICATION D'UN REVETEMENT D'ATTENUATION SUR DES COMPOSANTS A ONDES DE SURFACE

Publication

EP 1090387 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99936376 A

Priority

  • DE 9901608 W
  • DE 19828608 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0000961A1] The invention relates to a method for producing an attenuating coating on surface wave components using an attenuating, photohardenable resin by hardening the resin in correspondence with the required attenuating structure by image scanning illumination and by removing the non-hardened areas. Preferably, a UV laser is used for illumination.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10K 11/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10K 11/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10K 11/36 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0000961A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0000961 A1 20000106; EP 1090387 A1 20010411; EP 1090387 B1 20021030

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160624

- Year of fee payment: 18

2003-10-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-08-13 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: EPCOS AG

2002-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903262 20021205

2002-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE

2002-03-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020206

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001220

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE