Global patent index - EP 1090417 A1

EP 1090417 A1 2001-04-11 - METHOD FOR SINGLE CHAMBER PROCESSING OF PECVD-TI AND CVD-TIN FILMS IN IC MANUFACTURING

Title (en)

METHOD FOR SINGLE CHAMBER PROCESSING OF PECVD-TI AND CVD-TIN FILMS IN IC MANUFACTURING

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PECVD-TITANSCHICHTEN UND CVD-TITANNITRIDSCHICHTEN FÜR INTEGRIERTE SCHALTUNGEN IN EIN UND DERSELBEN REAKTIONSKAMMER

Title (fr)

PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE TRAITER AVEC UNE SEULE CHAMBRE UN DEPOT CHIMIQUE EN PHASE VAPEUR ACTIVE PAR PLASMA ET UN DEPOT CHIMIQUE EN PHASE VAPEUR DE FILMS DE TITANE DANS LA FABRICATION DE CIRCUITS INTEGRES

Publication

EP 1090417 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00926143 A

Priority

  • US 0010552 W
  • US 29448799 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0063959A1] A single chamber method for depositing a stack including titanium and titanium mitride on a wafer surface. Titanium is deposited by plasma enhanced chemical vapor deposition and then plasma nitrided. Titanium nitride is subsequently deposited by a thermal chemical vapor deposition process. Advantageously, the temperatures of the substrate and showerhead as well as the internal chamber pressue are maintained at substantially constant values throughout deposition of the stack.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01L 21/285; H01L 21/3205

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 16/30 (2006.01); C23C 16/02 (2006.01); C23C 16/14 (2006.01); C23C 16/34 (2006.01); C23C 16/56 (2006.01); H01L 21/28 (2006.01); H01L 21/285 (2006.01); H01L 21/768 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 21/76856 (2013.01); C23C 16/0218 (2013.01); C23C 16/14 (2013.01); C23C 16/34 (2013.01); C23C 16/56 (2013.01); H01L 21/28556 (2013.01); H01L 21/28568 (2013.01); H01L 21/76843 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0063959A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 0063959 A1 20001026; CN 1187795 C 20050202; CN 1304549 A 20010718; EP 1090417 A1 20010411; JP 2002542399 A 20021210; JP 3782938 B2 20060607; KR 100428521 B1 20040429; TW 463242 B 20011111; US 6274496 B1 20010814

INPADOC legal status

2012-05-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20111101

2004-12-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20041116

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2001-08-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: LEUSINK, GERRIT, J.

2001-08-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: WARD, MICHAEL, G.

2001-08-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: AMEEN, MICHAEL, S.

2001-08-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HILLMAN, JOSEPH, T.

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001211

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE