Global Patent Index - EP 1090437 A1

EP 1090437 A1 2001-04-11 - ANTENNA, USE OF AN ANTENNA OF THIS TYPE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME

Title (en)

ANTENNA, USE OF AN ANTENNA OF THIS TYPE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME

Title (de)

ANTENNE, VERWENDUNG EINER DERARTIGEN ANTENNE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER DERARTIGEN ANTENNE

Title (fr)

ANTENNE, SON UTILISATION ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION

Publication

EP 1090437 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00934860 A

Priority

  • DE 0001023 W
  • DE 19918060 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0065684A2] The inventive antenna comprises first and second convexly bent antenna elements (2, 3) which are connected in series by web segments (4, 5) in such a way as to reproduce the shape of a helix, said web segments running in the longitudinal direction of the antenna. An additional antenna element (6) can extend parallel to this helical arrangement. The antenna can be punched from a single metal part and bent into the desired shape, and is especially suitable for multiband applications.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/24 (2006.01); H01Q 1/36 (2006.01); H01Q 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/243 (2013.01); H01Q 1/244 (2013.01); H01Q 1/362 (2013.01); H01Q 5/371 (2013.01); H01Q 5/378 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0065684A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0065684 A2 20001102; WO 0065684 A3 20010301; CN 1162940 C 20040818; CN 1310868 A 20010829; EP 1090437 A1 20010411; EP 1090437 B1 20020904; US 2001005183 A1 20010628; US 6501438 B2 20021231

INPADOC legal status


2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101103

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090527

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-10-30 [PGRI DE] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGRI

- Effective date: 20090720

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080403

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081101

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-01-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20081231

2008-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080403

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070420

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070416

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-11-21 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2007-01-05 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2006-10-11 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-05-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

- Ref Document Number: 1090437E

- Country of Ref Document: IE

2003-03-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-12-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20021114

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50000439

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-10-10

2002-10-02 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-09-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010719

2001-05-02 [D17D] SEARCH REPORT (DELETED)

- Ref Legal Event Code: D17D

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001128

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI