Global Patent Index - EP 1090565 A2

EP 1090565 A2 2001-04-11 - Stud member for a snap fastener

Title (en)

Stud member for a snap fastener

Title (de)

Patrizenhälfte eines Druckknopfverschlüsses

Title (fr)

Elément mâle de bouton-pression

Publication

EP 1090565 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00120444 A

Priority

IT MI992088 A

Abstract (en)

An improved back-male assembly for snap fasteners comprises a cap for covering the surface of the head of the back-male assembly and having an upturned edge on the opposite surface of the web, for cooperating with a corresponding portion of the base of the fastener male assembly, for holding a material flap it is fixed to, thereby eliminating any needs of using a reinforcement washer, while allowing the covering cap to be quickly and simply applied to the exposed portion of the back-male assembly head. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A44B 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44B 17/0011 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1090565 A2 20010411; EP 1090565 A3 20020925; IT 1313772 B1 20020917; IT MI992088 A1 20010406; IT MI992088 D0 19991006

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20080401

2007-05-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030724

2006-11-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030724

2003-09-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030724

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20021219

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-06-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: RACCOSTA, GAETANO

2001-06-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: RACCOSTA, SANDRO

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI