Global Patent Index - EP 1090570 A1

EP 1090570 A1 2001-04-11 - Check-out counter for products

Title (en)

Check-out counter for products

Title (de)

Kassieranlage für Waren

Title (fr)

Comptoir d'enregistrement pour marchandises

Publication

EP 1090570 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00118499 A

Priority

DE 29917555 U

Abstract (en)

The apparatus has a transport arrangement (1), e.g. a conveyor belt, a price/quantity detector (2) at the end of the transport arrangement, and a cash register (3). The transport arrangement moves the goods (W) from the left with respect to the operator (P). The price/quantity detector is offset to the left towards the delivered goods by a defined extent (M) with respect to a central operator body plane (Z).

Abstract (de)

Gegenstand der Erfindung ist eine Kassieranlage für Waren (W), insbesondere Einzelhandelswaren (W). Diese Kassieranlage weist in ihrem grundsätzlichen Aufbau eine Fördervorrichtung (1), z. B. Transportband (1), und eine endseitig der Fördervorrichtung (1) angeordnete Preis-/Mengenerfassungseinrichtung (2) sowie eine Kasse (3) auf. Die Fördervorrichtung (1) führt die zu erfassenden Waren (W) im Vergleich zu einer Bedienperson (P) von links oder rechts her kommend zu. Dabei ist die Preis-/Mengenerfassungseinrichtung (2) gegenüber einer Körperzentralebene (Z) der Bedienperson (P) nach links oder rechts in Richtung auf die zugeführten Waren (W) um ein bestimmtes Maß (M) versetzt. Erfindungsgemäß schließt an die Fördervorrichtung (1) eine im Wesentlichen koplanare Warenerfass-/Verteilertheke (4) mit der Preis-/Mengenerfassungseinrichtung (2) an. Warenstromendseitig der Warenerfass-/Verteilertheke (4) ist wenigstens eine Parkeinrichtung (6) für einen Einkaufwagen (5) vorgesehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47F 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 9/04 (2006.01); G07G 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47F 9/04 (2013.01); G07G 1/0036 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0015376 A1 19800917 - NIXDORF COMPUTER AG [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE GB IE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29917555 U1 20000120; AT 229291 T 20021215; AU 6251200 A 20010412; AU 775894 B2 20040819; EP 1090570 A1 20010411; EP 1090570 B1 20021211

INPADOC legal status


2008-03-19 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20071018

2008-03-19 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20071018

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070823

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-11-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070816

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-06-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070629

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-17 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2005-08-25 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050825

2004-12-08 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ALDI EINKAUF GMBH & CO. OHG

2004-08-25 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20040825

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-12-31 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-04-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030329

2003-04-16 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: NORMA WARENHANDELS GMBH

- Effective date: 20030214

2003-01-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50000908 20030123

2003-01-22 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB IE

2002-12-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 229291 T 20021215

2002-08-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020703

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE GB IE

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010208

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB IE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI