Global Patent Index - EP 1090580 A2

EP 1090580 A2 2001-04-11 - Dishwasher with a wash tub

Title (en)

Dishwasher with a wash tub

Title (de)

Geschirrspülmaschine mit einem Spülbehälter

Title (fr)

Lave-vaiselle avec une cuve

Publication

EP 1090580 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00115700 A

Priority

DE 19946563 A

Abstract (en)

The storage container is a line section of the water supply which includes a water supply unit (16), which is fed from a water supply system and opens out in to a freely flowing stretch. The storage container is surrounded by a water supply container (16), which still has one or more chambers for the respective reception of a further amount of water. The free flowing stretch is surrounded by the water supply container. The rinsing container (2) air is led in an air duct, which is coupled areally, at least partly at the storage container.

Abstract (de)

In einer Geschirrspülmaschine mit einem Spülbehälter für ein während eines Spülprogrammes zu reinigendes Spülgut und einer Wasserzulaufeinrichtung für die Befüllung des Spülbehälters mit Spülflüssigkeit wird das Spülprogramm von einer Trocknungsphase abgeschlossen. Eine Wasservorratsmenge ist in einem außerhalb des Spülbehälters angeordneten Vorratsbehälter bevorratet. Während der Trocknungsphase ist eine im Spülbehälter vorliegende Spülbehälterluft in einem geschlossenen Kreislauf aus dem Spülbehälter herausführbar und anschließend wieder in den Spülbehälter rückführbar. Außerhalb des Spülbehälters ist die Spülbehälterluft mit der Wasservorratsmenge im Vorratsbehälter in einen wärmetauschenden Kontakt gesetzt. Gemäß der Erfindung ist der Vorratsbehälter ein Leitungsabschnitt der Wasserzulaufeinrichtung, welcher von einer Wasserversorgungsanlage gespeist wird und in eine freie Fließstrecke mündet. Auf diese Weise ist bei dieser Geschirrspülmaschine ein besonders gutes Trocknungsergebnis bei einem besonders niedrigen Teileaufwand ermöglicht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 15/48; A47L 15/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/42 (2006.01); A47L 15/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/48 (2013.01); A47L 15/42 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1090580 A2 20010411; EP 1090580 A3 20021023; EP 1090580 B1 20040929; DE 19946563 A1 20010412; DE 19946563 B4 20040325

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160725

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120721

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120731

2013-04-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20130329

2013-03-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20120721

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110721

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110729

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-09-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-05-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-04-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2005-02-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050121

2004-11-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50007971

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-11-04

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-11-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2004-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-09-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-11-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020916

2002-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI