Global Patent Index - EP 1090687 A1

EP 1090687 A1 2001-04-11 - Separator with shielded drum

Title (en)

Separator with shielded drum

Title (de)

Separator mit abgeschirmter Trommel

Title (fr)

Séparateur avec tambour blindé

Publication

EP 1090687 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00121624 A

Priority

DE 19948118 A

Abstract (en)

The side(3) of the separator's housing has at least three spaced apart walls(8,9,10) between which are formed cavities, with cooling medium in the radial inner cavity(11) and sound insulating medium in the radial outer cavity(12). The cooling medium is water or similar pumpable fluid which flows through the cavity. The sound insulating medium is a cellular material or may be formed on a base of sand, small glass balls, or suchlike. The housing is a sheet metal welded construction or a cast construction.

Abstract (de)

Separator mit einer schnelldrehend antreibbaren Trommel, und einer diese umgebenden Umhausung, deren Gehäusewandung zumindest bereichsweise mehrere mit etwa radialem Abstand aufeinanderfolgende Wände aufweist und die für eine optimalere Gesamtabschirmungswirkung derart ausgestaltet ist, dass die Gehäusewandung (3) wenigstens drei beabstandete Wände (8, 9, 10, 8', 9', 10') aufweist, von deren dazwischen gebildeten Hohlräumen (11, 11', 12, 12') der eine ein Kühlmittel (11, 11') und der andere ein Schallisoliermittel (12, 12') aufnehmen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B04B 7/02; B04B 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B04B 7/02 (2006.01); B04B 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B04B 15/02 (2013.01); B04B 7/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1090687 A1 20010411; DE 19948118 A1 20010426; DE 19948118 C2 20020627

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040501

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR IT SE

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011005

2001-06-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KOENIG, THOMAS

2001-06-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BASTIA, MASSIMILIANO

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI