Global Patent Index - EP 1090696 A2

EP 1090696 A2 2001-04-11 - Chain traction device for continuous drawing

Title (en)

Chain traction device for continuous drawing

Title (de)

Kettenziehmaschine zum kontinuierlichen Ziehen von Ziehgut

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'entrainement à chaines pour tréfilage en continu

Publication

EP 1090696 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00120496 A

Priority

DE 19947806 A

Abstract (en)

The machine has two or more driven drawing chains (3,4) with drawing members (5A,B) having clamp jaws for the drawn material on one side, and a slide surface on the other side. The slide surfaces support themselves on rigid roller guides (9) on each chain, via drive rollers (8). The drive rollers are interactively supported on the slide surfaces (13) and/or the roller guide via a divided contact surface, and on the level of the surface division, only via guides (31) moving with the rollers. The rollers are combined to form a chain.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Kettenziehmaschine zum kontinuierlichen Ziehen von insbesondere stangen- und rohrförmigem Ziehgut (1) aus Metall, mit wenigstens zwei antreibbaren, einer gemeinsamen Ziehstrecke zugewiesenen Triebketten (3,4), die jeweils miteinander verbundene Zugglieder (5A,5B) aufweisen, die an einer Seite mit einer an das Ziehgut (1) anpressbaren Klemmbacke (2) und an einer anderen Seite mit einer Gleitfläche (13) versehen sind, mit der sich die Zugglieder (5A,5B) über umlaufende, lasttragende Mitlaufrollen (8) an einer jeder Triebkette (3,4) zugeordneten, starren Rollenführung abstützen, wobei die Rollenführungen für die Triebketten mittels wenigstens einer sich im wesentlichen entlang der Ziehstrecke erstreckenden Entlastungsaussparung (11) in Führungsbahnen (9A,9B) geteilt sind. Durch Teilen der Gleitfläche (13) mittels einer Entlastungsaussparung (11) in Gleitbahnen (13A,13B) sowie durch Vorsehen einer Umfangsverjüngung in den sich über die gesamte Gleitfläche (13) erstreckenden Mitlaufrollen (8) wird ein elastischer Effekt in der Lagerung der Triebketten (3,4) erzielt, der für eine Erhöhung der tatsächlichen Tragzahl sorgt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21C 1/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16H 7/18 (2006.01); B21C 1/30 (2006.01); F16G 13/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21C 1/30 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1090696 A2 20010411; EP 1090696 A3 20020123; EP 1090696 B1 20040901; EP 1090696 B2 20090722; AT 275005 T 20040915; DE 19947806 A1 20010412; DE 19947806 B4 20141211; JP 2001146947 A 20010529; JP 4663865 B2 20110406; US 6450386 B1 20020917

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160930

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160916

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-03-23 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SMS GROUP GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SMS MEER GMBH, 41069 MOENCHENGLADBACH, DE

- Document: DE 50007602

2016-03-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50007602

- Representative's name: REUTHER, MARTIN, DIPL.-PHYS., DE

2012-03-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SMS MEER GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SMS SCHUMAG GMBH & CO. KG, 52076 AACHEN, DE

- Document: DE 50007602

- Effective date: 20120118

2012-03-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SMS GROUP GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SMS SCHUMAG GMBH & CO. KG, 52076 AACHEN, DE

- Document: DE 50007602

- Effective date: 20120118

2012-03-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50007602

- Representative's name: REUTHER, MARTIN, DIPL.-PHYS., DE

- Effective date: 20120118

2012-01-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50007602

- Representative's name: MARTIN REUTHER, DE

2009-08-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040921

2009-07-22 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20090722

2009-07-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050201

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SCHUMAG A.G.

- Effective date: 20040930

2005-09-02 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-08-17 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: DANIELI & C.OFFICINE MECCANICHE SPA

- Effective date: 20050530

2005-07-27 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: DANIELI & C.OFFICINE MECCANICHE SPA

- Effective date: 20050530

2005-05-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-04-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SCHUMAG A.G.

- Effective date: 20040930

2005-03-30 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040901

2005-03-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-12-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041212

2004-12-01 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-12-01 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-12-01 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-10-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50007602 P 20041007

2004-10-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-20 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040920

2004-09-20 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040920

2004-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-09-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-09-01 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-09-01 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-09-01 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-09-01 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-09-01 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-09-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040901

2002-10-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020723

2002-01-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-07-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HESSBERGER, DIRK

2001-07-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WALCZAK, BRUNO

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI