Global Patent Index - EP 1090700 A2

EP 1090700 A2 2001-04-11 - Formed strip and roll forming

Title (en)

Formed strip and roll forming

Title (de)

Umgeformter Blechstreifen und Umformung mittels Profilwalzvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Bande formée et formage par profileuse

Publication

EP 1090700 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99120154 A

Priority

EP 99120154 A

Abstract (en)

A V-shaped metal strip has a U-shaped bottom having U-shaped inside and outside surfaces. Only the U-shaped inside surface is formed with a plurality of fold lines extending in a longitudinal direction of the strip and reducing the influence of springback. The fold lines may be arranged in a manner of bilateral symmetry with respect to an imaginary median plane bisecting the V-shaped cross section of the metal strip. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 5/08; B21C 37/08; B21D 53/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 37/083 (2006.01); B21C 37/15 (2006.01); B21C 37/22 (2006.01); B21D 5/12 (2006.01); B21D 53/04 (2006.01); F28D 1/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28D 1/0391 (2013.01); B21C 37/083 (2013.01); B21C 37/155 (2013.01); B21C 37/225 (2013.01); B21D 5/12 (2013.01); B21D 53/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1090700 A2 20010411; EP 1090700 A3 20020515; EP 1090700 B1 20051228; DE 69929194 D1 20060202; DE 69929194 T2 20060622

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69929194

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101008

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101102

2011-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110630

2011-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101008

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091029

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091007

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091001

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-12-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060929

2006-08-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-02-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69929194 P 20060202

2005-12-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-12-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040921

2003-02-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-05-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991008

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI