Global Patent Index - EP 1090719 A1

EP 1090719 A1 2001-04-11 - Driving device for hexagonal wrenches

Title (en)

Driving device for hexagonal wrenches

Title (de)

Antriebsvorrichtung für Imbusschlüssel

Title (fr)

Moyens d'entraînement pour clefs hexagonales

Publication

EP 1090719 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99119148 A

Priority

EP 99119148 A

Abstract (en)

A driving device includes a hollow holding member having one end that has a retaining section formed on a mediate section of an inner periphery thereof. The retaining section includes two mutually facing stepped surfaces that together define a tapered space therebetween for securely folding one of two angled sections of a hexagonal wrench. The other end of the holding member includes a bottom wall that includes a notch defined therein for securely holding the other of the angled sections. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 15/00; B25G 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 15/00 (2006.01); B25G 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25G 1/005 (2013.01); B25B 15/008 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1090719 A1 20010411

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030624

2003-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030213

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT NL

2001-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010904

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI