Global Patent Index - EP 1090741 A2

EP 1090741 A2 2001-04-11 - Method and machine for making multi-page self-adhesive labels

Title (en)

Method and machine for making multi-page self-adhesive labels

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorichtung zur Herstellung VON MEHRSCHICHTIGEN ETIKETTEN

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la fabrication d'étiquettes à plusieurs couches

Publication

EP 1090741 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00830626 A

Priority

IT BS990093 A

Abstract (en)

This is a method and a machine to create multi-page self-adhesive labels. Starting from at least one sheet of paper or printed synthetic material (10) a non-stick substance (11) is applied to one portion of one face of the said sheet; glue (12) is spread onto a part of the sheet, coinciding or not coinciding with the part bearing the non-stick substance; the sheet is folded to form a paper-glue-non-stick substance-paper multi-layer; the sheet is folded again onto itself one or more times to form a multi-page pack and then everything is closed. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B31D 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31D 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B31D 1/021 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1090741 A2 20010411; EP 1090741 A3 20030618; IT 1310064 B1 20020205; IT BS990093 A1 20010402; IT BS990093 D0 19991001

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031219

2004-04-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 31D 1/02 A

2003-06-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 09F 3/02 B

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI