Global Patent Index - EP 1090743 A2

EP 1090743 A2 2001-04-11 - Electrochemical degradation-resistant coolant hose

Title (en)

Electrochemical degradation-resistant coolant hose

Title (de)

Gegen elektrochemischen Abbau beständiger Kühlmittelschlauch

Title (fr)

Tuyau de refroidissement résistant à la dégradation électrochimique

Publication

EP 1090743 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00306834 A

Priority

  • US 14799199 P
  • US 57255200 A

Abstract (en)

An automobile cooling system for an internal combustion engine with a radiator has coolant hoses connected to the radiator and adapted to be connected to an automobile engine to cool the same. The coolant hoses are constructed with an innermost layer of a thermoplastic elastomer which resists electrochemical degradation, an optional tie layer of a thermoset material surrounding the innermost layer, a reinforcement layer surrounding the optional tie layer, and a cover made of a thermoset material surrounding the reinforcement layer. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B32B 1/08; F16L 11/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B32B 1/08 (2006.01); F16L 11/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B32B 1/08 (2013.01); B32B 5/026 (2013.01); B32B 25/042 (2013.01); B32B 25/08 (2013.01); B32B 25/10 (2013.01); B32B 25/14 (2013.01); B32B 27/12 (2013.01); B32B 27/302 (2013.01); B32B 27/32 (2013.01); B32B 27/34 (2013.01); B32B 27/36 (2013.01); B32B 27/40 (2013.01); F16L 11/12 (2013.01); B32B 2262/02 (2013.01); B32B 2262/103 (2013.01); B32B 2307/714 (2013.01); B32B 2367/00 (2013.01); B32B 2375/00 (2013.01); B32B 2377/00 (2013.01); B32B 2597/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1090743 A2 20010411; EP 1090743 A3 20030924

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040325

2004-07-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-06-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-09-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-08-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 32B 1/08 A

2003-08-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 32B 25/10 B

2003-08-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 16L 11/08 B

2003-08-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 16L 11/12 B

2003-08-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 32B 27/32 B

2003-08-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 32B 27/40 B

2003-08-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 32B 27/36 B

2003-08-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 32B 27/34 B

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 32B 1/08 A

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 32B 25/10 B

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 16L 11/08 B

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 16L 11/12 B

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI