Global patent index - EP 1090753 A2

EP 1090753 A2 2001-04-11 - Printing cylinder, particularly for multicolour book printing

Title (en)

Printing cylinder, particularly for multicolour book printing

Title (de)

Druckzylinder, inbesondere für den Mehrfarben-Buchdruck

Title (fr)

Cylindre d'impression, en particulier pour l'impression des livres en plusieurs couleurs

Publication

EP 1090753 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00117793 A

Priority

DE 19948878 A

Abstract (en)

Printing blocks are applied precisely to the surface of the printing cylinder and aligned using stop pieces on the blocks and on the cylinder in the region of an axial surface line. The stop pieces include two axially spaced stops (4,5) on the cylinder, at least one of which (4) comprises an adjusting device (12) which is effective in the circumference direction. The stops may consist of matching pins which stand above the surface of the printing cylinder, and which match holes in the blocks.

Abstract (de)

Ein Druckzylinder (1,25,35) insbesondere für den Mehrfarben-Buchdruck mittels Druckklischees, die auf den Mantel (2) des Druckzylinders passergenau aufzubringen und dazu mit Hilfe von Anschlagelementen am Klischee und, im Bereich einer axialen Mantellinie (3), auf dem Druckzylinder auszurichten sind, wird zur schnelleren, präziseren und verläßlicheren Aufbringung der Druckklischees in der Weise ausgestaltet, daß die Anschlagelemente zylinderseitig zwei Anschläge (4,5,26,36) mit axialem Abstand voneinander aufweisen, von denen wenigstens ein Anschlag eine in Umfangsrichtung wirkende Stelleinrichtung (12,27,38,40) aufweist. Vorzugsweise erhalten die Druckklischees Paßlöcher vorgegebenen Querschnitts und Abstands und die Druckzylinderanschläge in Form von Paßstiften, die zumindest teilweise verstellbar sind und in die Paßlöcher eingreifen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 27/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 27/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1090753 A2 20010411; EP 1090753 A3 20020522; DE 19948878 A1 20010412

INPADOC legal status

2003-09-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021123

2003-03-20 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-02-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-05-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI