Global Patent Index - EP 1090754 A1

EP 1090754 A1 2001-04-11 - Device for changing a cylindrical printing sleeve

Title (en)

Device for changing a cylindrical printing sleeve

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Wechseln einer Druckzylinderhülse

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour échanger un manchon cylindrique à imprimer

Publication

EP 1090754 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99119764 A

Priority

EP 99119764 A

Abstract (en)

The framework has a drive side and a handling side. A cylinder core (36) containing the printing cylinder sleeve (38) is mounted in the framework so that the sleeve can be axially withdrawn on the handling side. An ejector (42) positioned on the drive side of the framework acts upon the end surface of the printing cylinder sleeve, and or a withdrawing-claw (44) on the drive side of the framework fits into a recess (48) on the edge of the printing cylinder sleeve.

Abstract (de)

Vorrichtung zum Wechseln einer Druckzylinderhülse (38) in einer Druckmaschine mit einem Gestell (14), das eine Antriebsseite und eine Bedienseite aufweist und in dem ein die Druckzylinderhülse aufnehmender Zylinderkem (36) derart gelagert ist, daß sich die Druckzylinderhülse axial zur Bedienseite hin abziehen läßt, gekennzeichnet durch einen auf der Antriebsseite des Gestells angeordneten, auf die Stirnfläche der Druckzylinderhülse (38) wirkenden Ausstoßer (42) und/oder eine auf der Antriebsseite des Gestells angeordnete Rückziehkralle (44), die lösbar in eine Vertiefung (48) am Rand der Druckzylinderhülse (38) eingreift. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 27/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 27/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 27/105 (2013.01); B41P 2227/21 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1090754 A1 20010411; EP 1090754 B1 20030806; DE 59906531 D1 20030911; ES 2205666 T3 20040501

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161024

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59906531

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160927

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160915

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091006

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091102

2010-07-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100630

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080917

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080919

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-07-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040507

2004-05-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2205666 T3

2003-12-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031205

2003-09-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906531 P 20030911

2003-08-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-08-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020313

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-11-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010918

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI