Global Patent Index - EP 1090825 A2

EP 1090825 A2 2001-04-11 - Twin-axle railway goods wagon

Title (en)

Twin-axle railway goods wagon

Title (de)

Zweiachsiger Eisenbahngüterwagen

Title (fr)

Wagon à marchandises à deux essieux

Publication

EP 1090825 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00890300 A

Priority

AT 171199 A

Abstract (en)

The goods wagon is designed so that the frame (1) is arranged underneath the middle of the buffers (3), and the buffer breast (29) of at least one head piece (2) is supported at the frame, additionally over at least one support, which pref. engages in the top end region of the buffer breast, esp. undetachably connected e.g. by a welding seam. leaf springs (17) and parabolic springs are fitted at the mountings of the running wheels (16).

Abstract (de)

Zweiachsiger Eisenbahngüterwagen für einen Normalspur- oder Breitspurzug mit einem nach oben im wesentlichen ebenen Rahmen (1) mit zumindest zwei Längsträgern (5), die über Querträger (6) verbunden sind, der an seinen beiden Enden je ein Kopfstück (2) mit einer Pufferbrust (29), die zwei Puffer (3) trägt, deren Mitte in Abstand, vorzugsweise etwa, bei leeren Wagen höchstens 1.065 mm und bei größter Belastung bei, vorzugsweise etwa, mindestens 940 mm, jeweils gemessen von der Schienenoberkante, liegt und zumindest einer Zugeinrichtung mit Zughaken und Kupplung, wobei der Rahmen (1) von Laufrädern (16) mit einem Laufkreisdurchmesser von, vorzugsweise etwa, 680 mm und größer, vorzugsweise kleiner 840 mm, und deren Achsen (31) über Blattfedern (17), die am Rahmen (1) über eine höhenunveränderliche Halterung befestigt sind, getragen ist, wobei der Rahmen (1) unterhalb der Mitte der Puffer angeordnet ist, und die Pufferbrust (29) von zumindest einem Kopfstück (2) an dem Rahmen (1) zusätzlich über zumindest eine Stütze (30), die vorzugsweise im oberen Endbereich der Pufferbrust (29) angreift, insbesondere unlösbar, z. B. durch eine Schweißnaht, verbunden ist, abgestützt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61F 1/10; B61D 3/04; B61D 3/16; B61D 47/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61D 3/04 (2006.01); B61D 3/16 (2006.01); B61D 47/00 (2006.01); B61F 1/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61D 3/16 (2013.01); B61D 3/04 (2013.01); B61D 47/00 (2013.01); B61F 1/10 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1090825 A2 20010411; EP 1090825 A3 20020410

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040814

2003-04-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030305

2003-02-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-01-08 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR

2003-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH LI

2003-01-02 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 20020924;SI PAYMENT 20020924

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020924

2002-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-04-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 61F 1/10 A, 7B 61D 3/04 B, 7B 61D 3/16 B, 7B 61D 47/00 B, 7B 61D 9/02 B, 7B 61D 15/00 B

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI