Global Patent Index - EP 1090842 A1

EP 1090842 A1 2001-04-11 - Device for packaging rolls

Title (en)

Device for packaging rolls

Title (de)

Rollenverpackungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'emballage de rouleaux

Publication

EP 1090842 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00121644 A

Priority

DE 19948610 A

Abstract (en)

The roll-packaging machine has a roll-support which has at least two rotary support rollers (5,6) at least one of which is driven. At least the roller nearest the dispenser has an elastic coating (16). A dispenser (4) dispenses the web of paper packaging material (3). The peripheral surface of the coating has a structure with raised sections.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Rollenverpackungsvorrichtung angegeben mit einer Rollenauflage, die mindestens zwei drehbare Tragwalzen (5) aufweist, von denen mindestens eine angetrieben ist und mit einem Verpackungsbahnspender zur Ausgabe einer Verpackungsbahn. Mit einer derartigen Rollenverpackungsvorrichtung möchte man auch schwerere Rollen verpacken können. Hierzu weist mindestens eine der beiden Tragwalzen (5) einen elastischen Belag (16) auf. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 25/14; B65B 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 11/04 (2006.01); B65B 25/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 11/04 (2013.01); B65B 25/148 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0499954 A1 19920826 - VALMET PAPER MACHINERY INC [FI]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FI LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1090842 A1 20010411; EP 1090842 B1 20030305; DE 19948610 A1 20010419

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141031

2015-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141031

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150501

2015-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141004

2015-05-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-05-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50001368

2014-02-28 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20131011

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131021

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20131021

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-05-26 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100501

2008-11-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20081015

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-02-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031208

2003-04-16 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2003-04-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: LUCHS & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE

2003-04-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50001368 P 20030410

2003-03-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE FI LI NL

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FI LI NL

2001-09-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010808

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010206

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FI LI NL

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI