Global patent index - EP 1090843 A2

EP 1090843 A2 2001-04-11 - Packaging machine, especially for filling and closing of containers containing liquid pharmaceuticals

Title (en)

Packaging machine, especially for filling and closing of containers containing liquid pharmaceuticals

Title (de)

Verpackungsmaschine, insbesondere zum Befüllen und Verschliessen von flüssige Pharamazeutika enthaltenden Behältnissen

Title (fr)

Machine d'emballage, spécialement pour remplir et fermer des récipients contenant des produits médicamenteux liquides

Publication

EP 1090843 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00119535 A

Priority

DE 19947786 A

Abstract (en)

The packaging machine (10) has a machine frame (12) enclosed by at least one covering plate and which has a hood-shaped insulator housing (15) joined to the cover-plate with intermediate sealing element to enclose an interior. The insulating housing comprises at least one covering plate. The sealing element is contained in a gap between one side surface of the covering plate, and the insulating housing.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Verpackungsmaschine (10), bestehend aus einem Maschinengestell (12) und einem mit dem Maschinengestell (12) dichtend verbundenen Isolatorgehäuse (15) vorgeschlagen. Die Verbindung erfolgt über am Maschinengehäuse (12) angeordnete Halter (45), auf denen ein Profilrahmen (46; 61) des Isolatorgehäuses (15) aufliegt. Zwischen dem Isolatorgehäuse (15) und dem Maschinengestell (12) ist ein Spalt (57) ausgebildet, in dem ein Dichtelement (58; 58a) angeordnet ist. Die erfindungsgemäße Verpackungsmaschine (10) ermöglicht standardisierte Maschinengestelle (12) sowie infolge der geringeren erforderlichen Toleranzen einen fertigungstechnisch einfacheren Aufbau. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 55/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 31/00 (2006.01); A61J 3/00 (2006.01); B65B 55/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 55/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1090843 A2 20010411; EP 1090843 A3 20020619; EP 1090843 B1 20040324; DE 19947786 A1 20010419; JP 2001158404 A 20010612; JP 4727803 B2 20110720; US 6651404 B1 20031125

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160926

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151125

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150923

- Year of fee payment: 16

2005-03-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041228

2004-11-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-10-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2004-09-22 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20040324

2004-04-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50005775

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-04-29

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-04-21 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2004-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-03-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: SCINTILLA AG, DIREKTION

2004-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2004-03-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040324

2004-03-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040324

2003-03-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-02-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20021219

2002-06-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI