Global Patent Index - EP 1090845 A1

EP 1090845 A1 2001-04-11 - Bottle crate

Title (en)

Bottle crate

Title (de)

Flaschenkasten

Title (fr)

Casier à bouteilles

Publication

EP 1090845 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00121613 A

Priority

  • DE 19948040 A
  • DE 20008668 U

Abstract (en)

A plastic drinks bottle crate has hand-holds or handles which are located at base level on opposite sides of the crate. The hand-holds may be pull-out handles linked by a loop, or hinged.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Flaschenkasten (1, 11, 21) zur Aufnahme mehrerer Flaschen, insbesondere Getränkeflaschen, mit mindestens einem Handgriff (6, 16, 26), der von einer passiven in eine aktive Stellung bewegt werden kann, dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß der Handgriff (6, 16, 26) bei seiner aktiven Stellung im wesentlichen auf gleicher Höhe mit einem Boden (2, 12, 22) des Flaschenkastens (1, 11, 21) liegt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 1/24; B65D 25/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 1/24 (2006.01); B65D 25/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 25/2835 (2013.01); B65D 1/243 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1090845 A1 20010411

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040622

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031119

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010918

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI