Global Patent Index - EP 1090849 A2

EP 1090849 A2 2001-04-11 - Plastic film pouch

Title (en)

Plastic film pouch

Title (de)

Beutel aus Kunststoffolie

Title (fr)

Sachet en film plastique

Publication

EP 1090849 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00121094 A

Priority

DE 19948191 A

Abstract (en)

The plastic bag (1) is provided with an adhesive seam (5) which is located close to the sealing seam (4) and serves for closing the bag after it has been opened by cutting away the sealing seam.

Abstract (de)

Beutel(1,21,31) aus Kunststoff-Folie mit einer Entnahmeöffnung, die verhältnismäßig schwer zu öffnen ist und damit dem Füllgut einen ausreichenden Schutz gewährt, wobei der Beutel(1,21,31) benachbart zur Entnahmeöffnung eine Klebenaht(5) aufweist, durch welche die Entnahmeöffnung wiederverschließbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 33/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 33/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 33/20 (2013.01); B65D 2101/0015 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1090849 A2 20010411; EP 1090849 A3 20020515; DE 19948191 A1 20010412

INPADOC legal status


2006-04-19 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20051128

2003-10-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-02-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021111

2002-05-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI