Global Patent Index - EP 1090852 A1

EP 1090852 A1 2001-04-11 - Packaging, for example for hygiene-health products

Title (en)

Packaging, for example for hygiene-health products

Title (de)

Verpackung für Hygieneprodukten

Title (fr)

Emballage pour produits d'hygiène

Publication

EP 1090852 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99830627 A

Priority

EP 99830627 A

Abstract (en)

Packaging which can be used e.g. for hygiene-health products comprises an envelope (2) to receive products (P) in which at least one opening (4) is provided for removal of the products (P) with an associated corresponding closure arrangement (5) which can be selectively moved between a position in which the opening is closed and a position in which the opening is free in order to permit the said products (P) to be removed through the said opening (4). Microhook attachment elements which can be selectively engaged and disengaged through the effect of moving the said closure arrangement (5) between the closed position and the open position are provided between closure arrangement (5) and the envelope (2). Sealing of the packaging is ensured by the abovementioned microhook elements (6, 7), preferably in combination with adhesive attachment means (5b). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 75/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 75/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 75/5838 (2013.01); B65D 2313/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1090852 A1 20010411

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030615

2003-03-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030204

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-08-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010611

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI