Global Patent Index - EP 1090854 A1

EP 1090854 A1 2001-04-11 - Installation for storing and retaining of containers, especially gas bottles

Title (en)

Installation for storing and retaining of containers, especially gas bottles

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur Lagerung und Rückhaltung von Behältern, insbesondere Gasflaschen

Title (fr)

Installation de stockage et de rétention de récipients, notamment de bouteilles de gaz

Publication

EP 1090854 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00402637 A

Priority

FR 9912496 A

Abstract (en)

The installation consists of prefabricated modular compartments (1A,1B,1C) which are readily transported to a work site and erected. Entry is gained through a first entry compartment (1A) which has an identification terminal (8) linked to an electromagnetic gate (6) and a remote station. The storage modules (1B,1C) have racks with lockable lids and remote indication for the bottles, ventilation (5) and lifting facilities (7)

Abstract (fr)

L'installation, réalisée par assemblage de modules caissons élémentaires de dimension standard (1A, 1B, 1C) comprenant chacun au moins une paroi latérale (4) pourvue d'ouvertures de ventilation (5), comporte un caisson de contrôle d'accès (1A) pourvu d'un poste de contrôle d'accès et d'identification (8) et d'une porte à ouverture électro-magnétique (6), et au moins un caisson de stockage (1B, 1C) sur les parois latérales en regard desquelles sont disposées des emplacements de réception de récipients pourvus de dispositifs de rétention sélectivement verrouillables connectés au poste de contrôle et d'identification (8). Application notamment à la distribution de bouteilles de gaz industriels sur site. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 88/12; B65D 88/74; B65D 90/22; B65D 90/66; F17C 13/08; G07F 7/06; G07F 7/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65G 1/00 (2006.01); F17C 13/08 (2006.01); G07F 7/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F17C 13/084 (2013.01); G07F 7/0609 (2013.01); F17C 2201/032 (2013.01); F17C 2201/056 (2013.01); F17C 2205/0111 (2013.01); F17C 2205/013 (2013.01); F17C 2205/0308 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

WO 9827380 A1 19980625 - AIR LIQUIDE [FR], et al

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1090854 A1 20010411; AR 025986 A1 20021226; AU 6247400 A 20010412; BR 0004638 A 20010612; CA 2321156 A1 20010407; FR 2799450 A1 20010413; FR 2799450 B1 20011109; JP 2001159500 A 20010612

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-29 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20020327

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: L'AIR LIQUIDE, S.A. A DIRECTOIRE ET CONSEIL DE SUR

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011011

2001-05-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LECARPENTIER, JEAN-CLAUDE

2001-05-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MCCORD, ANTHONY

2001-05-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: VERGHADE, JEAN-MARIE

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI