Global Patent Index - EP 1090860 A2

EP 1090860 A2 2001-04-11 - Mechanism for and method of feeding cards

Title (en)

Mechanism for and method of feeding cards

Title (de)

Mechanismus und Verfahren zum Zuführen von Karten

Title (fr)

Mécanisme et procédé pour alimenter des cartes

Publication

EP 1090860 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00308513 A

Priority

  • JP 27532099 A
  • JP 28490399 A
  • JP 28490999 A
  • JP 28491899 A

Abstract (en)

A card feed (1) for feeding cards (3) from a hopper (2), the card feed (1) comprising a card feeding mechanism for feeding cards (3) one by one from a gate portion (4) at the bottom of the hopper (2), which card feeding mechanism is operable to engage the back end (3b) of each card (3), wherein the gate portion (4) is adapted so that the back end of the card (3b) is pressed against the card (3) feeding mechanism when a part of the card comes through the gate portion (4). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 3/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 3/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 3/24 (2013.01); B65H 2301/42322 (2013.01); B65H 2701/1914 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1090860 A2 20010411; EP 1090860 A3 20030226

INPADOC legal status


2008-05-09 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1036610

2004-11-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-02-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031219

2003-11-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-11-12 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030430

- Countries: AL

2003-11-12 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030430

- Countries: LT

2003-11-12 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030430

- Countries: LV

2003-11-12 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030430

- Countries: MK

2003-11-12 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030430

- Countries: RO

2003-11-12 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030430

- Countries: SI

2003-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-02-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-02-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-02-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI