Global Patent Index - EP 1090871 A2

EP 1090871 A2 2001-04-11 - Driving device for roped passenger elevator

Title (en)

Driving device for roped passenger elevator

Title (de)

Antrieb für Personenseilaufzüge

Title (fr)

Machinerie d'ascenseur à câble pour passager

Publication

EP 1090871 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00120816 A

Priority

DE 19948584 A

Abstract (en)

The drive mechanism consists of a rotary current motor (1), a bolt-coupling/brake (2), a gear (3) and a driving disc (4) all forming an integral unit or machine. The motor is directly connected to the gear housing (7) by means of a coupling's container-lantern (6). The gear's input shaft (11) is in the form of a worm shaft engaging with a worm wheel (12) of the gear and positioned on an intermediate shaft (13).

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Antrieb für Personenseilaufzüge angegeben, der besonders flach baut. Dabei entspricht die Länge der Getriebeausgangswelle 16 mit der darauf angebrachten Treibscheibe 4 im wesentlichen dem Durchmesser des über die Aufnahmelaterne 6 der Kupplung 2 mit dem Gehäuse 7 des Getriebes 3 verbundenen Motors 1. Dadurch können keine überragenden Bauteile den Betrieb eines Personenseilaufzuges mit dem vorteilhaften Antrieb stören oder irgendwie beeinflussen, wenn dieser Antrieb an der senkrechten Wand 5 eines Aufzugschachtes platzsparend angebracht ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 11/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 11/0446 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1090871 A2 20010411; CN 1196641 C 20050413; CN 1292349 A 20010425; CO 5280117 A1 20030530; DE 19948584 A1 20010412; KR 20010067302 A 20010712; TR 200002931 A2 20010420

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050401

2004-05-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FLENDER TUEBINGEN GMBH

2004-03-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: A. FRIEDR. FLENDER AG

2001-07-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: A. FRIEDR. FLENDER GMBH

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI