Global Patent Index - EP 1090894 A1

EP 1090894 A1 2001-04-11 - Process for making fine particles of explosives

Title (en)

Process for making fine particles of explosives

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung feinpartikulärer Explosivstoffe

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication de fines particules d'explosifs

Publication

EP 1090894 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00121747 A

Priority

DE 19948133 A

Abstract (en)

Production of finely dispersed crystalline explosive comprises placing the explosive in an organic solvent in solution; spraying the solution into a super-critical fluid; absorbing the solvent by the super-critical fluid with crystallization of the explosive particles and removing the particles after expanding in a super critical state for the fluid. Production of finely dispersed crystalline explosive comprises placing the explosive in an organic solvent in solution; spraying the solution into a partially miscible super critical fluid in which the explosive is not or only sparingly soluble; absorbing the solvent by the super critical fluid with crystallization of the explosive particles and removing the particles after expanding in a super critical state for the fluid. The solution is sprayed using a multiple material nozzle or through a nozzle channel of a multiple material nozzle into the super critical fluid whilst a fluid is introduced into a further nozzle channel of the nozzle. Preferred Features: The super critical fluid is CO2, N2O, N2, H2O, NH3, CHnX4-n (where 0 n 3) or C2HmX6-m (where 0 m 5).

Abstract (de)

Zur Herstellung feindisperser kristalliner Explosivstoffe wird der Explosivstoff in einem organischen Lösungsmittel in Lösung gebracht, die Lösung in ein mit dem Lösungmittel mischbares überkritisches Fluid, in welchem der Explosivstoff nicht löslich ist, eingesprüht, das Lösungsmittel unter Auskristallisieren der Explosivstoff-Partikel von dem überkritischen Fluid aufgenommen und werden die Explosivstoff-Partikel nach Expandieren in einen für das überkritische Fluid unterkritischen Zustand abgetrennt. Die Lösung wird in einer Düsenströmung in das überkritsche Fluid eingesprüht, wobei die Lösung mittels einer Mehrstoffdüse oder durch einen Düsenkanal einer Mehrstoffdüse in das überkritische Fluid eingesprüht wird, während in einem weiteren Düsenkanal der Mehrstoffdüse ein Fluid zugeführt wird. Mit diesem Verfahren werden feine Explosivstoffpartikel mit definierter mittlerer Partikelgröße, enger Partikelgrößenverteilung und hoher Schüttdichte erhalten.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C06B 21/00; B01J 2/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01J 2/04 (2006.01); B01J 2/18 (2006.01); C06B 21/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01J 2/04 (2013.01); B01J 2/18 (2013.01); C06B 21/0066 (2013.01); C06B 21/0091 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XY] WO 9731691 A1 19970904 - UNIV KANSAS [US], et al & US 5874029 A 19990223 - SUBRAMANIAM BALA [US], et al
  • [X] GB 2322326 A 19980826 - BRADFORD PARTICLE DESIGN LTD [GB]
  • [Y] WO 9501221 A1 19950112 - UNIV BRADFORD [GB], et al
  • [Y] WO 9600610 A1 19960111 - UNIV BRADFORD [GB], et al
  • [PX] WO 9959710 A1 19991125 - BRADFORD PARTICLE DESIGN PLC [GB], et al
  • [A] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 129, no. 9, 31 August 1998, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 110963f, U. FOERTER-BARTH ET AL.: "Recrystallization of HMX with compressed gases as anti-solvent" page 813; XP000789732 & Int. Annu. Conf. ICT 1998, 29th(Energetic Materials), 67.1-67.10, Fraunhofer-Institut fuer Chemische Technologie
  • [Y] E. REVERCHON: "Supercritical antisolvent precipitation of micro- and nano-particles", JOURNAL OF SUPERCRITICAL FLUIDS, vol. 15, 1 May 1999 (1999-05-01), pages 1-21, XP000802617

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1090894 A1 20010411

INPADOC legal status


2001-07-25 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20010531

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI