Global Patent Index - EP 1090895 A1

EP 1090895 A1 2001-04-11 - Pyrotechnical charge for generating infrared radiation

Title (en)

Pyrotechnical charge for generating infrared radiation

Title (de)

Pyrotechnischer Satz zur Erzeugung von IR-Strahlung

Title (fr)

Charge pyrotechnique pour la génération de rayonnements infrarouges

Publication

EP 1090895 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00121713 A

Priority

DE 19964172 A

Abstract (en)

A pyrotechnical arrangement comprises 10-85% poly-(carbon monofluoride) as oxidant, 15-90% halophilic metallic fuel selected from magnesium, aluminum, titanium, zirconium, hafnium, calcium, beryllium and/or boron, 2.5-7.5% organic fluorine-containing binder and 0.1-5% graphite.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine pyrotechnische Wirkmasse zur Erzeugung von IR-Strahlung vorgestellt. Eine erfindungsgemäße Wirkmasse enthält einen Brennstoff (vorzugsweise Magnesium) welcher sich mit Fluor in stark exergonischer Reaktion verbindet (z.B. Li, Be, Mg, Ca, Sr, Ba, Ti, Zr, Hf, B, Al sowie deren Legierungen) und Poly(kohlenstoffmonofluorid) ((-CFx-)n) (x = 0,6 ­ 1,2) als Oxidationsmittel. Weiterhin enthalten erfindungsgemäße Sätze Viton als polymeren Binder und Graphit zur Reduktion der elektrostatischen Empfindlichkeit. Es wird ein Verfahren zur Herstellung dieser Sätze vorgestellt.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C06C 15/00; C06B 27/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C06B 27/00 (2006.01); C06C 15/00 (2006.01); C06D 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C06C 15/00 (2013.01); C06B 27/00 (2013.01); C06D 3/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1090895 A1 20010411; EP 1090895 B1 20030423; DE 19964172 A1 20010426; DE 19964172 B4 20060406; IL 138858 A 20040601; IL 138858 D0 20011031

INPADOC legal status


2017-03-03 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DIEHL DEFENCE GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: DIEHL BGT DEFENCE GMBH & CO. KG, 88662 UEBERLINGEN, DE

- Document: DE 50001847

2017-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20161019

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161215

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 16

2005-06-15 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2004-04-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040126

2004-02-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-09-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-08-12 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-05-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50001847 P 20030528

2003-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2003-04-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB SE

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010221

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI