Global Patent Index - EP 1090925 A1

EP 1090925 A1 2001-04-11 - Human G-protein coupled receptor

Title (en)

Human G-protein coupled receptor

Title (de)

Humaner G-Protein gekoppelter Rezeptor

Title (fr)

Récepteur humain couplé à la proteine G

Publication

EP 1090925 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00308853 A

Priority

GB 9923890 A

Abstract (en)

Polynucleotide and polypeptide sequences of a putative human G-protein coupled receptor are described. The polypeptide sequences comprise one or more of: (a) a polypeptide having the deduced amino acid sequence translated from the polynucleotide sequence in SEQ ID NO: 1 and variants, fragments, homologues, analogues and derivatives thereof; or (b) a polypeptide of SEQ ID NO: 2 and variants, fragments, homologues, analogues and derivatives thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 14/72; A61K 38/17; A61K 39/395; A61K 48/00; C07K 16/28; C12N 5/10; C12N 15/11; C12N 15/12; C12N 15/63; G01N 33/53

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 31/711 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/395 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 3/00 (2006.01); A61P 13/00 (2006.01); A61P 15/00 (2006.01); A61P 17/00 (2006.01); A61P 19/08 (2006.01); A61P 25/28 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 14/705 (2006.01); C07K 14/72 (2006.01); C07K 16/28 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/06 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 9/00 (2006.01); C12N 15/12 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12P 21/08 (2006.01); C12Q 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/723 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] JP H06234797 A 19940823 - TSUMURA & CO, et al
  • [PX] WO 0011166 A1 20000302 - MILLENNIUM PHARM INC [US]
  • [PX] WO 0022131 A2 20000420 - WHITE CAROL [US]
  • [PX] WO 0031258 A2 20000602 - ARENA PHARM INC [US], et al
  • [X] WO 9919513 A2 19990422 - LXR BIOTECHNOLOGY INC [US], et al
  • [PXD] DOE JOINT GENOME INSTITUTE: "Sequencing of Human Chromosome 19"; Homo sapiens chromosome 19 clone CTC-429L19, WORKING DRAFT SEQUENCE, 4 unordered pieces", EMBL DATABASE ENTRY AC011461; ACCESSION NO. AC011461, 8 October 1999 (1999-10-08), XP002158722
  • [PXD] BIRREN B. ET AL.: "Homo sapiens, clone RP11-163A20; LOW-PASS SEQUENCE SAMPLING", EMBL DATABASE ENTRY AC026510; ACCESSION NO. AC026510, 23 March 2000 (2000-03-23), XP002158723
  • [A] ALTSCHUL S. F. ET AL: "Iterated profile searches with PSI-BLAST-a tool for discovery in protein databases", TIBS TRENDS IN BIOCHEMICAL SCIENCES, vol. 23, no. 11, 1 November 1998 (1998-11-01), pages 444 - 447, XP004143492, ISSN: 0968-0004
  • [A] STADEL J.M. ET AL.: "Orphan G protein-coupled receptors: a neglected opportunity for pioneer drug discovery", TRENDS IN PHARMACOLOGICAL SCIENCES, no. 18, 1 November 1997 (1997-11-01), pages 430 - 437, XP002073279, ISSN: 0165-6147

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1090925 A1 20010411; GB 9923890 D0 19991208; JP 2001161382 A 20010619

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060503

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PFIZER LIMITED

2001-12-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PFIZER INC.

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001006

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI