Global Patent Index - EP 1090979 A1

EP 1090979 A1 2001-04-11 - Defoaming granulates

Title (en)

Defoaming granulates

Title (de)

Entschäumergranulate

Title (fr)

Granulés anti-mousse

Publication

EP 1090979 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99120217 A

Priority

EP 99120217 A

Abstract (en)

Defoamer granulate giving good foam reduction for solid washing, rinsing and detergent agent comprises a silicone aqueous emulsion applied to a carrier, dried and granulated to give at least 85 wt.% particles of average diameter below 1.5 mm.

Abstract (de)

Vorgeschlagen werden Entschäumergranulate für feste Wasch-, Spül- und Reinigungsmittel, enthaltend Trägermaterialien und Silicone, dadurch erhältlich, daß man Silicone in Form wäßriger Emulsionen auf ein zugemischtes Vorprodukt aus Trägermaterialien aufbringt und die Produkte gleichzeitig in der Wirbelschicht trocknet und granuliert, mit der Maßgabe, daß mindestens 85 Gew.-% der Teilchen einen mittleren Durchmesser unterhalb von 1,5 mm aufweisen.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/37; C11D 11/00; C11D 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01J 2/16 (2006.01); C11D 3/00 (2006.01); C11D 3/04 (2006.01); C11D 3/12 (2006.01); C11D 3/20 (2006.01); C11D 3/32 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 3/382 (2006.01); C11D 11/00 (2006.01); C11D 17/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/0026 (2013.01); C11D 3/373 (2013.01); C11D 11/0082 (2013.01); C11D 17/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1090979 A1 20010411; JP 2001158900 A 20010612

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050819

2005-06-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: COGNIS IP MANAGEMENT GMBH

2005-03-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050208

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH & CO. KG

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991009

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI