Global Patent Index - EP 1090981 A1

EP 1090981 A1 2001-04-11 - Fabric rejuvenating treatment

Title (en)

Fabric rejuvenating treatment

Title (de)

Auffrischungsbehandlung von Gewebe

Title (fr)

Traitement pour le rajeunissement des tissus

Publication

EP 1090981 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99870250 A

Priority

  • EP 99870250 A
  • EP 99870205 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention is directed to a domestic process for rejuvenating an old fabric by contacting said fabric with a high dose of enzyme for an efficient period of time and subsequently contacting said fabric with an enzyme inhibitor. The present invention further relates to a rejuvenating composition for use in such process and is also directed to the manufacture of a rejuvenating composition for use in such process.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/386; C11D 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/386 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/386 (2013.01); C11D 17/0073 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1090981 A1 20010411

INPADOC legal status


2002-12-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020605

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020125

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010914

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI